EP2976841 - METHODS FOR ENERGY-EFFICIENT UNICAST AND MULTICAST TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 Mail Station 3999 Dallas, TX 75265-5474 / US | [2016/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EKPENYONG, Anthony, E. 17660 Tatia Court San Diego, CA 92128 / US | 02 /
BENDLIN, Ralf, M. 3605 Bahama Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | 03 /
ONGGOSANUSI, Eko, N. 1430 Mcclure Drive Allen, TX 75013 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Runhua 7613 Finch Drive Plano, TX 75024 / US | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/04] | 01 /
EKPENYONG, Anthony, E. 7500 Kirby Drive Apt. 1512 Houston, TX 77030 / US | ||
02 /
BENDLIN, Ralf, M. 3605 Bahama Drive Plano, TX 75074 / US | |||
03 /
ONGGOSANUSI, Eko, N. 1430 Mcclure Drive Allen, TX 75013 / US | |||
04 /
CHEN, Runhua 7613 Finch Drive Allen, TX 75013 / US | Representative(s) | Zeller, Andreas, et al Texas Instruments Deutschland GmbH Haggertystraße 1 85356 Freising / DE | [2020/19] |
Former [2016/04] | Wojcik, Lucy Eleanor, et al Texas Instruments Limited Suite 31, West Devon Business Park Brook Lane Tavistock, Devon PL19 9DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 14740291.1 | 21.01.2014 | [2016/04] | WO2014US12318 | Priority number, date | US201361754429P | 18.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361754429 P | US201361767510P | 21.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767510 P | US201361767515P | 21.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361767515 P | US201361804089P | 21.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361804089 P | US201361804310P | 22.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361804310 P | US201361806269P | 28.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361806269 P | US201361808784P | 05.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361808784 P | US201361833726P | 11.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361833726 P | US201414158569 | 17.01.2014 Original published format: US201414158569 | [2016/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014113789 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2976841 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2976841 | Date: | 06.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 24.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/005, H04W4/18, H04L5/00 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
H04L5/005 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04L5/0051 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/04] | H04B7/005, H04W4/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN FÜR ENERGIEEFFIZIENTE UNICAST- UND MULTICAST-ÜBERTRAGUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2016/04] | English: | METHODS FOR ENERGY-EFFICIENT UNICAST AND MULTICAST TRANSMISSION IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2016/04] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'OPTIMISATION DE LA CONSOMMATION ÉLECTRIQUE POUR LES TRANSMISSIONS EN DIFFUSION INDIVIDUELLE ET EN DIFFUSION COLLECTIVE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE RADIOCOMMUNICATIONS | [2016/04] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/04] | 04.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/04] | 26.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/15] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 31.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.04.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.04.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 26.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 26.02.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 26.02.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.03.2018 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2015 | Decision despatched | 04.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 04.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2015 | Decision despatched | 04.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 04.12.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.01.2014 | AL | 06.05.2020 | AT | 06.05.2020 | CY | 06.05.2020 | CZ | 06.05.2020 | DK | 06.05.2020 | EE | 06.05.2020 | ES | 06.05.2020 | FI | 06.05.2020 | HR | 06.05.2020 | IT | 06.05.2020 | LT | 06.05.2020 | LV | 06.05.2020 | MC | 06.05.2020 | MK | 06.05.2020 | NL | 06.05.2020 | PL | 06.05.2020 | RO | 06.05.2020 | RS | 06.05.2020 | SE | 06.05.2020 | SI | 06.05.2020 | SK | 06.05.2020 | SM | 06.05.2020 | TR | 06.05.2020 | BG | 06.08.2020 | NO | 06.08.2020 | GR | 07.08.2020 | IS | 06.09.2020 | PT | 07.09.2020 | IE | 21.01.2021 | LU | 21.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 21.01.2014 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
MK | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 21.01.2014 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CY | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 21.01.2014 | |
AL | 06.05.2020 | ||
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
IE | 21.01.2021 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
LU | 21.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
MC | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SI | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
PL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SK | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
AT | 06.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2020 | ||
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
EE | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
DK | 06.05.2020 | ||
ES | 06.05.2020 | ||
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RO | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
SM | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 06.05.2020 | |
FI | 06.05.2020 | ||
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
NL | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
BG | 06.08.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
RS | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
HR | 06.05.2020 | ||
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
LV | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
GR | 07.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 06.05.2020 | |
LT | 06.05.2020 | ||
SE | 06.05.2020 | ||
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
PT | 07.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 06.05.2020 | |
NO | 06.08.2020 | ||
IS | 06.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 06.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010020771 (JI TINGFANG [US], et al) [X] 7,18 * page 2, paragraph 0027 - page 3, paragraph 0031; figures 2-3; claim 1 * [I] 8-10,19,20; | [A]WO2012023835 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 7-10,18-20 * page 1, paragraph 008 - paragraph 009 *; | [P]EP2608433 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XA] - NEC GROUP, "Requirements and necessary enhancements for Rel-12 NCT", vol. RAN WG1, no. New Orleans, USA; 20121112 - 20121116, (20121102), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-124856, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_71/Docs/, (20121102), XP050662633 [X] 1 * Options 1 and 2; page second - page fourth; tables 1-2 * [A] 2-6 | [X] - NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS ET AL, "General considerations on new carrier types", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-120711, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120131), vol. RAN WG1, no. Dresden, Germany; 20120206 - 20120210, XP050563095 [X] 1-6 * Sections 3.1 and 4; page 2 - page 4 * | [XI] - ALCATEL-LUCENT ET AL, "Design Considerations for Additional Carrier Types", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-114044 ADDITIONAL CARRIER TYPES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111108), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Francisco, USA; 20111114 - 20111118, XP050562209 [X] 1 * Sections 2; page 1 - page 3 * [I] 2-6 | [XAI] - SAMSUNG, "Performance of Frequency Multiplexing for Broadcast and Unicast", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-070528, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070110), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20070110, XP050104554 [X] 11 * figure 2 * [A] 13 [I] 12,14,15 | [XA] - HUAWEI, "Further Consideration on Multiplexing of Unicast and MBMS", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-060548, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060209), vol. RAN WG1, no. Denver, USA; 20060209, XP050101484 [X] 11 * figure 1 * [A] 12-15 | [A] - QUALCOMM EUROPE, "Longer CP for MBMS", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-070424, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070110), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sorrento, Italy; 20070110, XP050104455 [A] 14 * the whole document * | [XP] - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "MBMS Support on NCT", vol. RAN WG1, no. Barcelona, Spain; 20130819 - 20130823, (20130810), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-132957 MBMS SUPPORT ON NCT, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_74/Docs/, (20130810), XP050716193 [XP] 11-15 * figures 1-2 * | [XP] - LG ELECTRONICS, "RRM in New Carrier Type", vol. RAN WG1, no. St Julian; 20130128 - 20130201, (20130118), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-130252 (NCT RRM LG), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_72/Docs/, (20130118), XP050663384 [XP] 16,17 * Section 4; page 3 * | International search | [X]US2010020771 (JI TINGFANG [US], et al); | [A]US2011275394 (SONG OSOK [US], et al); | [Y]US2011310837 (CLASSON BRIAN K [US], et al); | [Y]US2012327895 (WALLÉN ANDERS [SE], et al); | [X]US2013003673 (DINAN ESMAEL [US]) | Examination | EP2988562 | - ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL ET AL, "ePDCCH in MBSFN subframes", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-122756, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120512), vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech; 20120521 - 20120525, XP050601083 |