EP2946815 - MUSCULAR EXERCISE EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lee, Seowon (Bupyeong-dong 2-ga) 3rd Floor 29 Bupyeong 2-gil Jung-gu, Busan 600-806 / KR | [2015/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/48] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/48] | Application number, filing date | 14740311.7 | 09.01.2014 | [2015/48] | WO2014KR00231 | Priority number, date | KR20130006339 | 21.01.2013 Original published format: KR 20130006339 | [2015/48] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014112743 | Date: | 24.07.2014 | Language: | KO | [2014/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2946815 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/012, A63B23/035, A63B23/02, A63B21/02, A63B21/00 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
A63B21/0004 (EP,US);
A63B21/012 (EP,KR,US);
A63B21/0125 (US);
A63B21/025 (EP,US);
A63B21/026 (EP,US);
A63B21/028 (EP,US);
A63B21/0552 (US);
A63B21/4007 (EP,US);
A63B21/4011 (EP,US);
A63B21/4017 (EP,US);
A63B21/4025 (EP,US);
A63B21/4035 (EP,US);
A63B21/4039 (US);
A63B21/4047 (EP,US);
A63B21/4049 (EP,US);
A63B23/02 (KR);
A63B23/0238 (EP,US);
A63B23/035 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2015/48] | A63B21/012, A63B23/035, A63B23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Title | German: | MUSKELTRAININGSVORRICHTUNG | [2015/48] | English: | MUSCULAR EXERCISE EQUIPMENT | [2015/48] | French: | MATÉRIEL D'EXERCICE MUSCULAIRE | [2015/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2015 | Translation filed | 20.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/48] | 14.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/03] | Divisional application(s) | EP17179721.0 / EP3257557 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9737727 (IACOB ALEXANDRU [RO]) [X] 1-9 * page 2 - page 4; figure - *; | [X]US5921904 (TOUPS LANNY J [US]) [X] 1-9 * figure - *; | [X]US5759138 (BOLAND KEVIN O'BRIEN [US]) [X] 1-9 * column 4 - column 5; figure - *; | [X]US4681315 (YANG TAI-HER [TW]) [X] 1-9 * figure - *; | [A]DE2338756 (NAMYSLO HEINZ) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US6090023 (LIU CHAO-JIH [TW]) [X] 1 * column 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005054498 (CHIU LU-YING [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]WO9737727 (IACOB ALEXANDRU [RO]); | [A]KR19990004917U (LIN, I SHUN); | [A]US2007027008 (LEVINSON MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]KR200449833Y (KIM, KI SOO ET AL.) |