EP3024449 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS USING CUMINALDEHYDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Entre-deux-Villes 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/28] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHLIG GONZALEZ, Stéphanie Rue du Champ du Bois 18 CH-1052 Le Mont-sur-Lausanne / CH | 02 /
MEYLAN MERLINI, Jenny Ch. des Sauges 9 CH-1018 Lausanne / CH | 03 /
CAMACHO, Susana Ch. d'Orzens 50 CH-1095 Lutry / CH | 04 /
LE COUTRE, Johannes Ch. du Fau-Blanc 32 CH-1009 Pully / CH | [2019/34] |
Former [2016/22] | 01 /
MICHLIG GONZALEZ, Stéphanie Rue du Champ du Bois 18 CH-1052 Le Mont sur Lausanne / CH | ||
02 /
MEYLAN MERLINI, Jenny Chemin des Sauges 9 CH-1018 Lausanne / CH | |||
03 /
CAMACHO, Susana Chemin des Bruyères 5 CH-1007 Lausanne / CH | |||
04 /
LE COUTRE, Johannes Chemin du Fau-Blanc 32 CH-1009 Pully / CH | Representative(s) | Chautard, Cécile Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2019/34] |
Former [2016/22] | Chautard, Cécile Nestec S.A. CT-IAM Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 14741290.2 | 18.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014EP65473 | Priority number, date | US201361857051P | 22.07.2013 Original published format: US 201361857051 P | [2016/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015011037 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3024449 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3024449 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/11, A61P1/06, A61P1/00 | [2019/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/11 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/22] | A61K31/11, A61P1/00, A61P3/04, A61P3/10, A61P25/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND CUMINALDEHYD UND METHODEN | [2019/18] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS USING CUMINALDEHYDE | [2016/22] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANTS DE L'ALDEHYDE CUMINIQUE ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2019/18] |
Former [2016/22] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN MIT CUMINALDEHYD | ||
Former [2016/22] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS UTILISANT UN ALDÉHYDE DE CUMIN | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.03.2019 | 25.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.04.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2014 | AL | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 18.07.2014 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2009263514 (GOPINATHAN GOVINDAN [US]) [X] 12-14,17 * the whole document * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0077] * [A] 1-5; | [XA]US2010159028 (SHULTZ JENNIFER [US]) [X] 12,17 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0062] * * claim 15 * [A] 1-5; | [XA]JPH1042826 ; | [X]US2012189734 (TEK KONTHIRITH [FR], et al) [X] 12-14,17 * the whole document * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0042] * * claims 22,28 *; | [XI]KR20030090396K (NATUROBIOTECH CO LTD [KR]) [X] 10-12 * the whole document * * "Technical field"; page 2 * * page 3, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 2 * * claims 1-5 * [I] 13,14,17; | [XI]JP2010083796 ; | [XA] - HOI-SEON LEE, "Cuminaldehyde: Aldose Reductase and [alpha]-Glucosidase Inhibitor Derived from Cuminum cyminum L. Seeds", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (20050406), vol. 53, no. 7, doi:10.1021/jf048451g, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 2446 - 2450, XP055139971 [X] 10-14,17 * the whole document * * abstract * * page 2446, paragraph l - page 2447, paragraph 1 * * page 2449, paragraph l * * page 2449, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph l * [A] 1-5 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf048451g | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 17, Database accession no. 1998-186830, XP002729708 & JPH1042826 A 19980217 (HOUSE SHOKUHIN KOGYO KK) [X] 12-14,17 * abstract * [A] 1-5 | [XI] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2010, no. 28, Database accession no. 2010-E08423, XP002731415 & JP2010083796 A 20100415 (KIRIN BREWERY KK) [X] 12-14,17 * abstract * [I] 6-11 | [X] - KALIA A N ET AL, "Hypoglycemic and insulin release effects of cuminaldehyde: A new hypoglycemic natural compound from cumin oil", MEDICINAL & AROMATIC PLANTS ABSTRACTS, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS, NEW DELHI - INDIA, (20051001), vol. 27, no. 5, ISSN 0250-4367, XP018009841 [X] 10,11 * abstract * | Examination | - Michael Bandell ET AL, "Noxious Cold Ion Channel TRPA1 Is Activated by Pungent Compounds and Bradykinin", Neuron, United States, doi:10.1016/S0896-6273(04)00150-3, (20040101), pages 849 - 857, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0896627304001503/pdfft?md5=a4a242e5eb8b082a0765dc8573c5a3b8&pid=1-s2.0-S0896627304001503-main.pdf, XP055572686 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0896-6273(04)00150-3 | - Satoru Ebihara ET AL, "Sensory Stimulation to Improve Swallowing Reflex and Prevent Aspiration Pneumonia in Elderly Dysphagic People", Journal of Pharmacological Sciences, (20110101), vol. 115, no. 2, doi:10.1254/jphs.10R05CP, ISSN 1347-8613, pages 99 - 104, XP055183480 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/jphs.10R05CP | - Miyako Yamasaki ET AL, "Effects of capsiate on the triggering of the swallowing reflex in elderly patients with aspiration pneumonia", GERIATRICS AND GERONTOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, AU, (20100101), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1447-0594.2009.00566.x, ISSN 1444-1586, pages 107 - 109, XP055572684 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1447-0594.2009.00566.x | - ROFES LAIA ET AL, "Natural capsaicinoids improve swallow response in older patients with oropharyngeal dysphagia", GUT, BRITISH MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, LONDON, UK, (20130901), vol. 62, no. 9, doi:10.1136/GUTJNL-2011-300753, ISSN 0017-5749, pages 1280 - 1287, XP009183786 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/gutjnl-2011-300753 | - EBIHARA TAKAE ET AL, "Effects of menthol on the triggering of the swallowing reflex in elderly patients with dysphagia", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOL, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBL, GB, (20060901), vol. 62, no. 3, doi:10.1111/J.1365-2125.2006.02666.X, ISSN 0306-5251, pages 369 - 371, XP009114215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2125.2006.02666.x |