EP3005973 - SYSTEM WITH DENTAL IMPLANT AND ASSYMETRIC ABUTMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | SYSTEM OF PROSTHETIC ATTACHMENTS FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS, USE AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | ||
[2019/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seguro Dias, Gonçalo Pires Antunes Rua Duque de Palmela 30 - 8C 1250-098 Lisboa / PT | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Miranda de Sousa, João Paulo Vaz Garrigues IP, Unipessoal Lda. Av. da República, 25-1° 1050-186 Lisboa / PT | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14741992.3 | 06.06.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014PT00038 | Priority number, date | PT20130106995 | 07.06.2013 Original published format: PT 10699513 | [2016/15] | Filing language | PT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014196884 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | PT | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3005973 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3005973 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61C8/005 (EP);
A61C8/0018 (EP);
A61C8/0098 (EP);
A61C8/0077 (EP);
A61C8/008 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT ZAHNIMPLANTAT UND ASSYMETRISCHEM AUFBAUPFOSTEN | [2019/44] | English: | SYSTEM WITH DENTAL IMPLANT AND ASSYMETRIC ABUTMENT | [2019/44] | French: | SYSTÈME AVEC IMPLANT DENTAIRE ET PILIER ASYMÉTRIQUE | [2019/44] |
Former [2016/15] | SYSTEM VON PROTHESENAUFSÄTZEN FÜR ZAHNIMPLANTATE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | ||
Former [2016/15] | SYSTEM OF PROSTHETIC ATTACHMENTS FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS, USE AND METHOD OF USE THEREOF | ||
Former [2016/15] | SYSTÈME DE PIÈCES D'ADJONCTION PROTHÉTIQUES POUR IMPLANTS DENTAIRES, UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2015 | Translation filed | 22.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 20.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2018 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 12.06.2018 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 01.10.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.11.2019 | 24.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2014 | AL | 18.03.2020 | AT | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | DK | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | IE | 06.06.2020 | LU | 06.06.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | GB | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 06.06.2014 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 06.06.2014 | |
AT | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
GB | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
IE | 06.06.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
LU | 06.06.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 18.03.2020 | |
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
DK | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6244868 (SCHAPPERT DOUGLAS ALAN [CA]) [X] 1-6,8,10,11,14,18 * column 5, lines 53-60 * * column 7, lines 22-34; figures 9-13 *; | [X]DE202012102746U (GADAU CURD [DE], et al) [X] 1-13,15-18 * paragraphs [0021] , [0052] , [0064] , [0073]; figures 1,3-5 *; | [X]US2012264081 (PHILIBIN TERRY B [US]) [X] 1-6,10-12,16 * paragraphs [0040] , [0067]; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2012045735 (DRAPEAU SUSAN J [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figure 9 * | Examination | WO2006084346 | by applicant | WO2006138353 | WO2010141342 | WO2012158769 |