EP3013411 - PADDLE LEADS AND LEAD ARRANGEMENTS FOR DORSAL HORN STIMULATION AND SYSTEMS USING THE LEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOWARD, Joshua, Dale 3442 38th Street Sacramento, CA 95817 / US | 02 /
PIANCA, Anne, Margaret 122 Montana Avenue Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | 03 /
LEE, Dongchul 11163 Lewis Hill Drive Agua Dulce, CA 91390 / US | 04 /
CARBUNARU, Rafael 11916 Otsego Street Valley Village, CA 91067 / US | [2016/21] |
Former [2016/18] | 01 /
HOWARD, Joshua, Dale 9900 Jordan Ave. 75 Chatsworth, CA 91311 / US | ||
02 /
PIANCA, Anne, Margaret 122 Montana Avenue Santa Monica, CA 90403 / US | |||
03 /
LEE, Dongchul 11163 Lewis Hill Drive Agua Dulce, CA 91390 / US | |||
04 /
CARBUNARU, Rafael 11916 Otsego Street Valley Village, CA 91067 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/18] | Application number, filing date | 14742626.6 | 23.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014US43641 | Priority number, date | US201361840240P | 27.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361840240 P | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014209877 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3013411 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
A61N1/0553 (EP,US);
A61N1/36071 (EP,US);
A61N1/36103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | PADDLE-ELEKTRODEN UND ELEKTRODENANORDNUNGEN ZUR DORSALHORNSTIMULATION UND SYSTEME MIT DEN ELEKTRODEN | [2016/18] | English: | PADDLE LEADS AND LEAD ARRANGEMENTS FOR DORSAL HORN STIMULATION AND SYSTEMS USING THE LEADS | [2016/18] | French: | DÉRIVATIONS DE LANGUETTE ET AGENCEMENTS DE DÉRIVATION POUR UNE STIMULATION DE CORNE DORSALE, ET SYSTÈMES UTILISANT LES DÉRIVATIONS | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 29.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010057177 (MOFFITT MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0029] , [ 0072] - [0078]; figures 2-5 *; | [XI]US2008046050 (SKUBITZ SEAN P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7 * paragraphs [0023] - [0024]; figure 1A * [I] 11; | [XAI]US2010280570 (STURM VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11 * paragraphs [0062] - [0071]; figures 11,12,14B * [A] 6 [I] 10; | [X]WO2008005142 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,7,11 * paragraphs [0010] , [ 0257]; figure 38 *; | [X]US2006253182 (KING GARY W [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7,11 * paragraphs [0002] , [ 0080]; figure 5 *; | [A]WO2005007238 (CAMPBELL JAMES N [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 1, lines 5-12 * * page 3, line 23 - page 4, line 18; figures 2-3 * | [A] - RICHARD B NORTH, "Neural Interface Devices: Spinal Cord Stimulation Technology", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, IEEE. NEW YORK, US, (20080701), vol. 96, no. 7, ISSN 0018-9219, pages 1108 - 1119, XP011215885 [A] 1-11 * page 1111, column 1 * * page 1113; figure 3 * * page 1114, column 1; figure 4 * | Examination | EP1218057 | US2012016453 |