EP2950060 - DIGITAL LIQUID-LEVEL SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MultiDimension Technology Co., Ltd. No. 7 Guangdong Road Zhangjiagang Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang Jiangsu 215634 / CN | [2022/19] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states MultiDimension Technology Co., Ltd. No. 7 Guangdong Road Zhangjiagang Free Trade Zone Jiangsu 215634 / CN | ||
Former [2022/10] | For all designated states MultiDimension Technology Co., Ltd. No. 7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | ||
Former [2021/02] | For all designated states Multidimension Technology Co., Ltd. No. 7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | ||
Former [2015/49] | For all designated states Multidimension Technology Co., Ltd. No. 7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang Jiangsu 215634 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAK, James Geza Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | 02 /
XUE, Songsheng Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | [2022/14] |
Former [2022/10] | 01 /
DEAK, James Geza c/o MultiDimension Technology Co., Ltd. No. 7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | ||
02 /
XUE, Songsheng c/o MultiDimension Technology Co., Ltd. No. 7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | |||
Former [2021/02] | 01 /
DEAK, James Geza No. 7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | ||
02 /
XUE, Songsheng No.7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Suzhou, Jiangsu 215634 / CN | |||
Former [2015/49] | 01 /
DEAK, James Geza No. 7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Zhangjiagang Jiangsu 215634 / CN | ||
02 /
XUE, Songsheng No.7 Guangdong Road Free Trade Zone Suzhou Jiangsu 215634 / CN | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/14] |
Former [2015/49] | Benson, Christopher, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14742929.4 | 24.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014CN71351 | Priority number, date | CN20131029455 | 25.01.2013 Original published format: CN201310029455 | [2015/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014114259 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2950060 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2950060 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/74, G01F23/72 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G01F23/74 (EP,US);
G01F23/62 (US);
G01F23/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/49] | G01F23/74 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIGITALER FLÜSSIGKEITSPEGELSENSOR | [2015/49] | English: | DIGITAL LIQUID-LEVEL SENSOR | [2015/49] | French: | CAPTEUR NUMÉRIQUE DE NIVEAU DE LIQUIDE | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2015 | Translation filed | 25.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 04.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.10.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2020 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 06.04.2022 | AT | 06.04.2022 | CZ | 06.04.2022 | DK | 06.04.2022 | EE | 06.04.2022 | ES | 06.04.2022 | FI | 06.04.2022 | HR | 06.04.2022 | IT | 06.04.2022 | LT | 06.04.2022 | LV | 06.04.2022 | MC | 06.04.2022 | NL | 06.04.2022 | PL | 06.04.2022 | RO | 06.04.2022 | RS | 06.04.2022 | SE | 06.04.2022 | SI | 06.04.2022 | SK | 06.04.2022 | SM | 06.04.2022 | BG | 06.07.2022 | NO | 06.07.2022 | GR | 07.07.2022 | IS | 06.08.2022 | PT | 08.08.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
IT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SI | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 06.04.2022 | |
AT | 06.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
CZ | 06.04.2022 | ||
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
EE | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RO | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
SK | 06.04.2022 | ||
SM | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
DK | 06.04.2022 | ||
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
IS | 06.08.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
PL | 06.04.2022 | ||
RS | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
HR | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
LV | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
BG | 06.07.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
GR | 07.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 06.04.2022 | |
ES | 06.04.2022 | ||
FI | 06.04.2022 | ||
LT | 06.04.2022 | ||
NL | 06.04.2022 | ||
SE | 06.04.2022 | ||
NO | 06.07.2022 | ||
PT | 08.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 06.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5056049 (O'NEILL TIMOTHY P [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 13, line 55 - column 14, line 36; figures 1-8,12,13 * * column 16, lines 47-68 * * column 17, lines 30-61 * * column 18, line 62 - column 19, line 13 * * column 22, line 55 - column 23, line 9 * * column 23, line 65 - column 24, line 11 * * column 42, lines 31-65 *; | [A]WO9817982 (SENGHAAS KARL A [US]) [A] 1-15* claims 1,9,15,24 *; | [A]WO0206845 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 14 - page 4, line 8 *; | [A]US2011074399 (BARTOS AXEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0012] *; | [A]DE102010025170 (MEAS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0053] , [0060] , [0061]; figure 1 * | International search | [Y]CN1580717 (LIU MINKAI [CN]); | [Y]CN102768057 (GUANGDONG MEDIA REFRIGERATION EQUIPMENT CO LTD); | [XP]CN202814504U (WUHAN SENSOR ELECTRONIC CO LTD); | [XP]CN103105216 (FOSHAN CHUANDONG MAGNETIC ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [XP]CN203053525U (FOSHAN CHUANDONG MAGNETOELECTRICITY CO LTD); | [XP]CN203083663U (JIANGSU MULTIDIMENSION TECH CO) |