EP2949197 - BLADE FOR CUTTING GRASSES IN GENERAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2019 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dominguez de Vidaurreta Mendinueta, Miguel Angel C/ Río 10 31840 Uharte Arakil (Navarra) / ES | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/49] | Application number, filing date | 14743341.1 | 24.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014ES70051 | Priority number, date | ES201330084P | 25.01.2013 Original published format: ES 201330084 P | [2015/49] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014114841 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | ES | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2949197 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2949197 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 31.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01D34/73 | [2015/49] | CPC: |
A01D34/73 (EP,ES,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | BA | 19.08.2015 | ME | 19.08.2015 | Title | German: | MESSER ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON GRÄSERN IM ALLGEMEINEN | [2015/49] | English: | BLADE FOR CUTTING GRASSES IN GENERAL | [2015/49] | French: | LAME POUR LA COUPE D'HERBES EN GÉNÉRAL | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2015 | Translation filed | 19.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2014 | AL | 22.08.2018 | AT | 22.08.2018 | CY | 22.08.2018 | CZ | 22.08.2018 | DK | 22.08.2018 | EE | 22.08.2018 | ES | 22.08.2018 | FI | 22.08.2018 | HR | 22.08.2018 | IT | 22.08.2018 | LT | 22.08.2018 | LV | 22.08.2018 | MC | 22.08.2018 | MK | 22.08.2018 | NL | 22.08.2018 | PL | 22.08.2018 | RO | 22.08.2018 | RS | 22.08.2018 | SE | 22.08.2018 | SI | 22.08.2018 | SK | 22.08.2018 | SM | 22.08.2018 | TR | 22.08.2018 | BG | 22.11.2018 | NO | 22.11.2018 | GR | 23.11.2018 | IS | 22.12.2018 | PT | 22.12.2018 | GB | 24.01.2019 | IE | 24.01.2019 | LU | 24.01.2019 | MT | 24.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | FR | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.01.2014 | |
AL | 22.08.2018 | ||
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
MT | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CY | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
MT | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
PT | 22.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
MT | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
TR | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
IE | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
GB | 24.01.2019 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
MC | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SI | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
DK | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
SM | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
AT | 22.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
EE | 22.08.2018 | ||
ES | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
SK | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
CZ | 22.08.2018 | ||
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
PL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RO | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
IT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 22.08.2018 | |
FI | 22.08.2018 | ||
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
LV | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
HR | 22.08.2018 | ||
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
RS | 22.08.2018 | ||
SE | 22.08.2018 | ||
BG | 22.11.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
GR | 23.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NL | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 22.08.2018 | |
LT | 22.08.2018 | ||
NO | 22.11.2018 | ||
IS | 22.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 22.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US2799985 (ROSENBERG PAUL H); | [X]US4628672 (JONES GROVER W [US]); | [A]US4977735 (DAVIS JOHN W [US]); | [A]US5209052 (CARROLL WILLIAM R [US]); | [X]US6415591 (TYLKA SR ROMAN J [US]); | [A]FR2855715 (COLLARD MICHEL [FR]); | [A]US2011277438 (PERRUSO JR ANTHONY P [US]); | [A]US2012198807 (UPHAM MATTHEW [US]) |