EP2948542 - ENGINEERED PHYSICAL ALIGNMENT OF STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2021 [2021/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Li, Ronald Mount Sinai School of Medicine 1428 Madison Avenue Stran Berg Lab Building Floor 3, Room 323 New York, NY 10029 / US | For all designated states Khine, Michelle University of California 5141 California Avenue Suite 200 Irvine, CA 92617 / US | [2015/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/49] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Main, Malcolm Charles Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14743690.1 | 23.01.2014 | [2015/49] | WO2014US12816 | Priority number, date | US201361755871P | 23.01.2013 Original published format: US 201361755871 P | [2015/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014116874 | Date: | 31.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2948542 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.07.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, C12N5/077 | [2016/28] | CPC: |
C12N5/0657 (EP,US);
A61P9/04 (EP);
C12N2501/155 (EP,US);
C12N2501/16 (EP,US);
C12N2501/415 (EP,US);
C12N2506/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/49] | C12N5/00, C12N5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Title | German: | MANIPULIERTE PHYSIKALISCHE AUSRICHTUNG VON KARDIOMYOZYTEN AUS STAMMZELLEN | [2015/49] | English: | ENGINEERED PHYSICAL ALIGNMENT OF STEM CELL-DERIVED CARDIOMYOCYTES | [2015/49] | French: | ALIGNEMENT PHYSIQUE MODIFIÉ DE CARDIOMYOCYTES PROVENANT DE CELLULES SOUCHES | [2015/49] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/49] | 09.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/29] | 05.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2011028579 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 14 - page 21; examples 1-7 * [I] 10-15; | [A]WO2012115658 (EMPIRE TECHNOLOGY DEV LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI] - JESUS ISAAC LUNA ET AL, "Multiscale Biomimetic Topography for the Alignment of Neonatal and Embryonic Stem Cell-Derived Heart Cells", TISSUE ENGINEERING. PART C, METHODS DEC 2008, US, (20110501), vol. 17, no. 5, doi:10.1089/ten.tec.2010.0410, ISSN 1937-3384, pages 579 - 588, XP055276741 [X] 1-9 * page 582 - page 585 * [I] 10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ten.tec.2010.0410 | [XI] - AARON CHEN ET AL, "Shrink-Film Configurable Multiscale Wrinkles for Functional Alignment of Human Embryonic Stem Cells and their Cardiac Derivatives", ADVANCED MATERIALS, DE, (20111108), vol. 23, no. 48, doi:10.1002/adma.201103463, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 5785 - 5791, XP055270262 [X] 1-9 * page 5789 - page 5790 * [I] 10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201103463 | [XPI] - WANG JIAXIAN ET AL, "Effect of engineered anisotropy on the susceptibility of human pluripotent stem cell-derived ventricular cardiomyocytes to arrhythmias", BIOMATERIALS, (20131130), vol. 34, no. 35, doi:10.1016/J.BIOMATERIALS.2013.07.039, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 8878 - 8886, XP028699870 [XP] 1-9 * the whole document * [I] 10-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biomaterials.2013.07.039 | International search | [Y]US2012027807 (CHIEN KENNETH R [US], et al); | [Y]WO2012115658 (EMPIRE TECHNOLOGY DEV LLC [US], et al); | [Y]US2012200008 (KHINE MICHELLE [US], et al) | [Y] - CHEN, A ET AL., "Shrink-Film Configurable Multiscale Wrinkles For Functional Alignment Of Human Embryonic Stem Cells And Their Cardiac Derivatives.", ADVANCED MATERIALS., (20111222), vol. 23, no. 48, doi:10.1002/ADMA.201103463, pages 5785 - 5791, XP055270262 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201103463 | by applicant | - KARAKIKES et al., Stem Cells Transl Med., (20140000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 18 - 31 | WO2010US46670 |