EP3010666 - METHOD AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PROFILED TUBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senni, Marco Via S. Mamante 1816 47522 Cesena (FC) / IT | [2020/01] |
Former [2016/17] | For all designated states Senni, Marco Via del Priolo 82 Cesena / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAGAGNI, Rudi c/o Iron's Technology S.r.l. Via Bagnolo 14 I-47522 Cesena / IT | [2016/17] | Representative(s) | Cataldi, Giulia, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2016/17] | Application number, filing date | 14744174.5 | 20.06.2014 | [2016/17] | WO2014IB62494 | Priority number, date | IT2013BO00313 | 20.06.2013 Original published format: IT BO20130313 | [2016/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014203223 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3010666 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B21D15/04 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
B21D15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/17] | Extension states | BA | 16.12.2015 | ME | 16.12.2015 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROFILROHREN | [2016/17] | English: | METHOD AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF PROFILED TUBES | [2016/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET INSTALLATION POUR LA PRODUCTION DE TUBES PROFILÉS | [2016/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/17] | 04.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/22] | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US1837294 (SCHEID EDWARD M) [X] 4 * page 1, line 44 - line 71; figure 1 *; | [A]US3533267 (BUNNELL THEODORE R) [A] 1,4 * column 8, line 46 - column 10, line 58; figure - *; | [A]US4137353 (FARIELLO LEONARD A) [A] 1,4 * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 13; figure - *; | [A]JPS59209430 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 8 * abstract *; | [XI]ITRA20110019 (SENNI MARCO) [X] 4-6 * the whole document * [I] 1-3,7-9; | [A]EP2567762 (NEXANS [FR]) [A] 1* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * |