EP3031130 - ELECTRICAL MACHINE WITH PERMANENT MAGNET ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/24] | ELECTRICAL MACHINE | ||
[2020/19] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bühler Motor GmbH Anne-Frank-Strasse 33-35 90459 Nürnberg / DE | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHREIBER, Thomas Hohenwiesäcker 3 92342 Freystadt / DE | 02 /
BONK, Georg Gablonzer Strasse 8 90522 Oberasbach / DE | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 14744450.9 | 05.06.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014DE200246 | Priority number, date | DE201310215812 | 09.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013215812 | [2016/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015018402 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3031130 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/28, H02K1/27 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
H02K1/276 (EP,CN,US);
H02K1/274 (US);
H02K1/28 (EP,CN,US);
H02K15/03 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE MIT PERMANENTMAGNETROTOR | [2020/19] | English: | ELECTRICAL MACHINE WITH PERMANENT MAGNET ROTOR | [2020/19] | French: | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE AVEC ROTOR À AIMANTS PERMANENTS | [2020/19] |
Former [2016/24] | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE | ||
Former [2016/24] | ELECTRICAL MACHINE | ||
Former [2016/24] | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 19.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 24.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.08.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |