EP3044475 - SYNCHRONOUS BELT WITH BELT FASTENER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2018 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIG Technology AG Laufengasse 18 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOLLBARTH, Jürgen Im Barnhold 10 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | 02 /
VON BIRGELEN, Bernd Am Haas 26 52525 Waldfeucht / DE | 03 /
KLAUS, Markus Goethestrasse 52 52249 Eschweiler / DE | [2017/03] |
Former [2016/29] | 01 /
VOLLBARTH, Jürgen Im Barnhold 10 32457 Porta Westfalica / DE | ||
02 /
VON BIRGELEN, Bernd Am Haas 26 52525 Waldfeucht / DE | |||
03 /
JENKEL, Markus Goethestrasse 52 52249 Eschweiler / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 14744594.4 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014EP66396 | Priority number, date | DE201310110027 | 12.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013110027 | [2016/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015036163 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044475 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3044475 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F16G3/08 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
F16G3/08 (EP,US);
F16G1/28 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNCHRONRIEMEN MIT RIEMENSCHLOSS | [2016/29] | English: | SYNCHRONOUS BELT WITH BELT FASTENER | [2016/29] | French: | COURROIE SYNCHRONE POURVUE D'UNE ATTACHE DE COURROIE | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 19.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | MK | 11.10.2017 | MT | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | RS | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | SM | 11.10.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MK | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PT | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
SM | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 11.10.2017 | |
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RS | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102004025170 (NK KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-3 * |