EP3021960 - COOLING BETWEEN MULTIPLE POLYOLEFIN POLYMERIZATION REACTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.04.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Phillips Chemical Company LP 10001 Six Pines Drive The Woodlands, Texas 77380 / US | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHANDARKAR, Maruti 26025 Kingshill Drive Kingwood, Texas 77339 / US | 02 /
BENHAM, Elizabeth A. 9310 Katie Grace Circle Spring, Texas 77379 / US | 03 /
GONZALES, Rebecca A. 114 Heights Boulevard Unit A Houston, Texas 77007 / US | 04 /
MUTCHLER, Joel A. 20706 Lavone Drive Porter, Texas 77365 / US | 05 /
GILL, Catherine M. 2303 River Blossom Lane Kingwood, Texas 77345 / US | 06 /
ODI, Timothy O. 5227 Maple Hill Trail Kingwood, Texas 77345 / US | 07 /
NGUYEN, Thanh 1027 Cardinal Avenue Sugarland, Texas 77478 / US | 08 /
KUFELD, Scott E. 1331 Prospect Houston, Texas 77004 / US | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/21] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14744681.9 | 27.06.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014US44593 | Priority number, date | US201313934627 | 03.07.2013 Original published format: US201313934627 | [2016/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015002835 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3021960 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/18, B01J19/00, C08F10/02, C08F10/00, C08F6/00, C08F6/18 | [2016/21] | CPC: |
B01J19/0013 (EP,US);
B01J19/1818 (EP,US);
B01J19/1837 (EP,US);
C07C2/06 (US);
C08F10/00 (US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08F2/01 (EP,US);
C08F2/14 (US);
C08F6/001 (EP,US);
C08J11/02 (US);
B01J2219/0004 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00054 (US);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00103 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08F6/001, C08L23/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Title | German: | KÜHLUNG ZWISCHEN MEHREREN POLYOLEFIN-POLYMERISATIONSREAKTOREN | [2016/21] | English: | COOLING BETWEEN MULTIPLE POLYOLEFIN POLYMERIZATION REACTORS | [2016/21] | French: | REFROIDISSEMENT ENTRE DE MULTIPLES RÉACTEURS DE POLYMÉRISATION DES POLYOLÉFINES | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 06.01.2016 | Observations by third parties | 02.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.10.2022 | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008141965 (INEOS MFG BELGIUM NV [BE], et al); | [X]EP2030678 (TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RES FELUY [BE]); | [X]EP2557093 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) |