EP3014527 - EXTRACTING CARD DATA USING CARD ART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.02.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 09.03.2022 [2022/10] | 04.02.2022 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2016/18] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Xiaohang 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
SHAMSI, Farhan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
OKSHTEIN, Yakov 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 04 /
KUMAR, Sanjiv 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 05 /
ROWLEY, Henry Allan 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 06 /
MITCHELL, Marcus Quintana 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 07 /
REPENNING, Debra Lin 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 08 /
RODRIGUES, Jose Jeronimo Moreira Rua Luis Derouet n8 r/c Dto 1250-152 Lisbon / PT | 09 /
LI, Zhifei 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14744687.6 | 27.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014US44719 | Priority number, date | US201361841260P | 28.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361841260 P | US201314062655 | 24.10.2013 Original published format: US201314062655 | US201314077862 | 12.11.2013 Original published format: US201314077862 | US201314077780 | 12.11.2013 Original published format: US201314077780 | [2016/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014210548 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3014527 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/22, G06Q20/32, H04N1/00 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
G06V30/416 (EP,US);
G06K7/10 (US);
G06Q20/3223 (US);
G06Q20/3276 (US);
G06Q20/34 (US);
G06Q20/36 (US);
G06V30/142 (US);
G06V30/224 (US);
G06V30/2253 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Title | German: | EXTRAKTION VON KARTENDATEN KARTE MIT KARTENDESIGN | [2016/18] | English: | EXTRACTING CARD DATA USING CARD ART | [2016/18] | French: | EXTRACTION DES DONNÉES D'UNE CARTE À L'AIDE DE L'APPARENCE DE CETTE CARTE | [2016/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 01.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.10.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/10] | 01.02.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/10] | Appeal following examination | 22.11.2017 | Appeal received No. T0384/18 | 24.01.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2011091092 (NEPOMNIACHTCHI GRIGORI [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * paragraphs [0331] - [0339]; figures 42-43 *; | [I]US2013051610 (ROACH JOHN J [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - "Optical Character Recognition (OCR) -How it worksoptical-character-recognition-ocr-how", (20120205), URL: http://www.nicomsoft.com/optical-character-recognition-ocr-how-it-works/, (20141016), XP055147204 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - Från Wikipedia, "Luhn-algoritmen", (20130313), URL: http://sv.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Luhn-algoritmen&oldid=20410261, (20141020), XP055147626 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | [A] - JASON KINCAID, "Card.io's SDK Makes Entering Credit Card Information As Easy As Taking A Snapshot", INTERNET CITATION, (20110623), page 1, URL: http://techcrunch.com/2011/06/23/card-ios-sdk-makes-entering-credit-card-information-as-easy-as-taking-a-snapshot/, (20130619), XP002699050 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | US2013004076 |