EP3017033 - OPTIMISED METHOD FOR BREAKING CHLORELLA WALLS BY MECHANICAL CRUSHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corbion Biotech, Inc. One Tower Place Suite 600 South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2018/27] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Roquette Frères 1 rue de la Haute Loge 62136 Lestrem / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOURSEL, Béatrice 4A place de Busnettes F-62920 Gonnehem / FR | 02 /
DELANNOY, François 85 Rue du Marais F-62157 Allouagne / FR | 03 /
PATINIER, Samuel 84 Rue de Lille F-59890 Quesnoy-sur-Deule / FR | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Becker et Associés 25, rue Louis le Grand 75002 Paris / FR | [2016/19] | Application number, filing date | 14745206.4 | 03.07.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014FR51704 | Priority number, date | FR20130056577 | 04.07.2013 Original published format: FR 1356577 | [2016/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015001261 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3017033 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3017033 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12N1/06, B02C17/16 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
C12N1/066 (EP,MX,US);
C12M47/06 (EP,MX,US);
B02C17/16 (EP,MX,US);
B02C17/20 (US);
B02C23/00 (US);
B02C23/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTIMIERTES VERFAHREN ZUM BRECHEN VON CHLORELLA-WÄNDEN DURCH MECHANISCHES ZERKLEINERN | [2016/19] | English: | OPTIMISED METHOD FOR BREAKING CHLORELLA WALLS BY MECHANICAL CRUSHING | [2016/19] | French: | PROCEDE OPTIMISE DE RUPTURE DES PAROIS DE CHLORELLES PAR BROYAGE MECANIQUE | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 30.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.07.2014 | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | CZ | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | IT | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | PL | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | NO | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | IE | 03.07.2020 | LU | 03.07.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 03.07.2014 | |
AL | 12.02.2020 | ||
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 03.07.2014 | |
AT | 12.02.2020 | ||
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
IE | 03.07.2020 | ||
LU | 03.07.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CZ | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
IT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
PL | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 12.02.2020 | |
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
NO | 12.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
NO | 12.05.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1432039 (DAI NIPPON SUGAR MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * page 2, line 4 - line 36 ** page 3, line 12 - line 53 *; | [Y]WO2012109642 (PHYCAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0077] * * claims 1,4 *; | [Y] - MOLINA GRIMA ET AL, "Downstream Processing of cell-mass and products", HANDBOOK OF MICROALGAL CULTURE: BIOTECHNOLOGY AND APPLIED PHYCOLOGY, BLACKWELL/WILEY, (20040101), pages 215 - 251, ISBN 978-0-632-05953-9, XP008160049 [Y] 1-5 * page 232 * | [A] - Anonymous, "Ceramic Grinding Beads", (20060101), PROCESS TECHNOLOGIES FOR TOMORROW, URL: http://imperia.mi-verlag.de/imperia/md/upload/product/8r25_hosokawa_power_beads_engl.pdf, (20140410), XP055113545 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - DOUCHA J ET AL, "Influence of processing parameters on disintegration of Chlorella cells in various types of homogenizers", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20080829), vol. 81, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00253-008-1660-6, ISSN 1432-0614, pages 431 - 440, XP019654147 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00253-008-1660-6 |