EP2952093 - AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITION IN FORM OF AQUEOUS SUSPENSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meiji Seika Pharma Co., Ltd. 4-16, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8002 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Co. Ltd. 1-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO Atsushi c/o Meiji Seika Pharma Co. Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 02 /
YABUZAKI Mitsuyuki c/o Meiji Seika Pharma Co. Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 03 /
UENO Shigeru c/o Meiji Seika Pharma Co. Ltd. 760 Morooka-cho Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-8567 / JP | 04 /
MURAMATSU Yoshinori c/o Nippon Kayaku Co. Ltd. 6 Sunayama Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0255 / JP | 05 /
OGAWA Kazuteru c/o Nippon Kayaku Co. Ltd. 6 Sunayama Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0255 / JP | 06 /
SHIRAKURA Hidetoshi c/o Nippon Kayaku Co. Ltd. 6 Sunayama Kamisu-shi Ibaraki 314-0255 / JP | [2015/50] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2015/50] | Application number, filing date | 14745494.6 | 29.01.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014JP51986 | Priority number, date | JP20130015951 | 30.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013015951 | [2015/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014119620 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2952093 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01N47/06, A01N43/42, A01N25/04, A01N25/30, A01P3/00, A01P7/04 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
A01N25/04 (EP,RU,US);
A01N25/30 (RU,US);
A01N47/06 (RU,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/04, A01N43/42, A01N47/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/50] | A01N25/04, A01N25/30, A01N47/06, A01P3/00, A01P7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Title | German: | AGROCHEMISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG IN FORM EINER WÄSSRIGEN SUSPENSION | [2015/50] | English: | AGROCHEMICAL COMPOSITION IN FORM OF AQUEOUS SUSPENSION | [2015/50] | French: | COMPOSITION AGROCHIMIQUE SOUS FORME DE SUSPENSION AQUEUSE | [2015/50] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2015 | Translation filed | 18.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 06.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/14] | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/14] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2012157205 ; | [A]WO0035284 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-4* claims 1, 8, 9 *; | [A]EP1780202 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * preparation examples 1-5 * * claims 9, 10 *; | [A]EP2540709 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * example 2 * * comparative example 1 * * test example 2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 79, Database accession no. 2012-Q15811, XP002757932 & WO2012157205 A1 20121122 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2006013896 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al); | [A]WO2011105349 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012240931 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK) | by applicant | JPH09175904 | JPH09208404 | JP2002532395 | WO2006013896 | JP2010163401 | JP2011016741 | JP2011079741 | - ., The Pesticide Manual 15th edition, BRITISH CROP PROTECTION COUNCIL |