08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
20.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.12.2020 [2020/52] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
10.07.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
10.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] |
05.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
17.05.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
14.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
14.05.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.05.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.05.2019 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
22.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.11.2018 |
Change - German title |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
23.04.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.01.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.01.2018 |
First examination report |
|
19.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.06.2016 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
08.04.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.05.2016 [2016/19] |
30.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2015 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
06.11.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
14.08.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.07.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
17.07.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|