Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013116364 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013059801 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013040396 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012155135 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2013 | A3 | WO2012155135 | 15.11.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020185816 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016790662 | 13.02.2020 | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201213471058 | 14.05.2012 | US201715448239 | 02.03.2017 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9900054 | Global Dossier | 20.02.2018 | B2 | US2017070263 | 09.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201615355908 | 18.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9853746 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2017 | B2 | US2016241347 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615139145 | 26.04.2016 | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201314137939 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9787349 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2017 | B2 | US2015065069 | 05.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414533545 | 05.11.2014 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201213618138 | 14.09.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9344201 | Global Dossier | 17.05.2016 | B2 | US2014106680 | 17.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201314137939 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9559790 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2017 | B2 | US2013196598 | 01.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8757501 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2014 | B2 | US2013183903 | 18.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201313784581 | 04.03.2013 | US201213471058 | 14.05.2012 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | US201213471052 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9705204 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2017 | B2 | US2013106673 | 02.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213657476 | 22.10.2012 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8909135 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2014 | B2 | US2013070817 | 21.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201213618138 | 14.09.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9614590 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2017 | B2 | US2012290760 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201213471058 | 14.05.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8714459 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2014 | B2 | US2012286049 | 15.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | US201213471052 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11923598 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2024 | B2 | US2022115764 | 14.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016790662 | 13.02.2020 | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201213471058 | 14.05.2012 | US202117558883 | 22.12.2021 | US201715448239 | 02.03.2017 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10707557 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2020 | B2 | US2019379103 | 12.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615360647 | 23.11.2016 | US201916450790 | 24.06.2019 | US201414533545 | 05.11.2014 | US201815988957 | 24.05.2018 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201213618138 | 14.09.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10601105 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2020 | B2 | US2017179572 | 22.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201213471058 | 14.05.2012 | US201715448239 | 02.03.2017 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10381713 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2019 | B2 | US2018277927 | 27.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615360647 | 23.11.2016 | US201414533545 | 05.11.2014 | US201815988957 | 24.05.2018 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201213618138 | 14.09.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10236936 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2016337005 | 17.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615224435 | 29.07.2016 | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10110324 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B2 | US2018109329 | 19.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615139145 | 26.04.2016 | US201715845036 | 18.12.2017 | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201314137939 | 20.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10027018 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2018 | B2 | US2017077591 | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615360647 | 23.11.2016 | US201414533545 | 05.11.2014 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201213618138 | 14.09.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102020703B | Global Dossier | 10.09.2019 | B1 | KR20150112014 | 06.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | WO2014US12716 | 23.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101995608B | Global Dossier | 17.10.2019 | B1 | KR20140082815 | 02.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US61345 | 22.10.2012 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101879907B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2018 | B1 | KR20140068182 | 05.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55488 | 14.09.2012 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101796341B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2017 | B1 | KR20140035398 | 21.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | WO2012US37795 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101768993B | Global Dossier | 17.08.2017 | B1 | KR20140124420 | 24.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013US23886 | 30.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6363646B | Global Dossier | 25.07.2018 | B2 | JP2016106497 | 16.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016106496 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6166329B | Global Dossier | 19.07.2017 | B2 | JP2016040957 | 24.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6097767B | Global Dossier | 15.03.2017 | B2 | JP2015511440 | 16.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013US23886 | 30.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5844472B | Global Dossier | 20.01.2016 | B2 | JP2014531814 | 27.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55488 | 14.09.2012 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5951756B | Global Dossier | 13.07.2016 | B2 | JP2014516221 | 07.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | WO2012US37795 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2810377 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2019 | B1 | EP2810377 | 10.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013US23886 | 30.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2769477 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US61345 | 22.10.2012 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2759067 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2019 | B1 | EP2759067 | 30.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55488 | 14.09.2012 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2707968 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2019 | B1 | EP2707968 | 19.03.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | WO2012US37795 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106876373B | Global Dossier | 14.06.2019 | B | CN106876373 | 20.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201380015101 | 30.01.2013 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106330268B | Global Dossier | 22.01.2019 | B | CN106330268 | 11.01.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201280054333 | 14.09.2012 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106059634B | Global Dossier | 02.04.2019 | B | CN106059634 | 26.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | CN201280034365 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105379029B | Global Dossier | 11.05.2018 | B | CN105379029 | 02.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | WO2014US12716 | 23.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104205657B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2017 | B | CN104205657 | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | WO2013US23886 | 30.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104115418 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US55488 | 14.09.2012 | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104115417 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US61345 | 22.10.2012 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103650362B | Global Dossier | 03.08.2016 | B | CN103650362 | 19.03.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | WO2012US37795 | 14.05.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2951937 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2019 | B1 | EP2951937 | 14.12.2016 | A4 | EP2951937 | 09.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 | WO2014US12716 | 23.01.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI620489B | 01.04.2018 | B | TW201249293 | 01.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161485543 | 12.05.2011 | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | US201261607449 | 06.03.2012 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI554165B | 11.10.2016 | B | TW201320838 | 16.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201325344 | 16.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161549378 | 20.10.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI634832B | 01.09.2018 | B | TW201338693 | 16.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI619410B | 21.03.2018 | B | TW201644336 | 16.12.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | US201161570709 | 14.12.2011 | US201161535277 | 15.09.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI634834B | 01.09.2018 | B | TW201717738 | 16.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261592491 | 30.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014120545 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2015 | A3 | WO2014120545 | 07.08.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 |