EP2951937 - SHIELDED EHF CONNECTOR ASSEMBLIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keyssa, Inc. 655 Campbell Technology Parkway, Suite 275 Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2015/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCORMACK, Gary, D. 444 Castro Street, Suite 305 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | 02 /
ISAAC, Roger, D. 444 Castro Street, Suite 305 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [2019/48] |
Former [2015/50] | 01 /
MCCORMACK, Gary, D. 444 Castro Street Suite 305 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | ||
02 /
ISAAC, Roger, D. 444 Castro Street Suite 305 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/48] |
Former [2015/50] | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14746888.8 | 23.01.2014 | [2015/50] | WO2014US12716 | Priority number, date | US201313754694 | 30.01.2013 Original published format: US201313754694 | [2015/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014120545 | Date: | 07.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2951937 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2951937 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.10.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04B15/00, H04B5/00, H01R13/719 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
H04B5/72 (EP,US);
H01R13/6581 (CN);
H01L23/66 (EP,US);
H01R12/70 (CN);
H01R12/71 (CN);
H01R12/716 (CN);
H04B15/00 (US);
H04B15/02 (US);
H04B5/00 (US);
H04L43/16 (US);
H01L2223/6677 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3025 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/3011, H01L2924/00 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2015/50] | H04B15/00, H04B5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABGESCHIRMTE EHF-VERBINDERANORDNUNGEN | [2015/50] | English: | SHIELDED EHF CONNECTOR ASSEMBLIES | [2015/50] | French: | ENSEMBLES DE CONNECTEURS BLINDÉS POUR BANDE EHF | [2015/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 05.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2019 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2014 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | IE | 23.01.2020 | LU | 23.01.2020 | FR | 27.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | CH | 31.01.2020 | LI | 31.01.2020 | BG | 27.02.2020 | GB | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.01.2014 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 23.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
FR | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 23.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
FR | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
IE | 23.01.2020 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
FR | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
GB | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
FR | 27.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
CH | 31.01.2020 | ||
LI | 31.01.2020 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
FR | 27.01.2020 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
LU | 23.01.2020 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02091616 (FORMFACTOR INC [US], et al) [A] 10* page 26, line 20 - page 27, line 6; figures 17a-17c *; | [Y]US2004020674 (MCFADDEN JEFF [US], et al) [Y] 2-4 * paragraphs [0034] - [0041]; figure 1A *; | [YA]WO2006013638 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 9,10 * abstract * [A] 11; | [YA]US2007152053 (BIK TADEUSZ M [CA]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0025] - [0034]; figures 1-3 * [A] 11; | [Y]WO2010124165 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [Y] 12 * paragraph [0048]; figure 13 *; | [XPAYI]EP2581994 (TYCO ELECTRONICS NEDERLAND BV [NL], et al) [XP] 1,5 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0102]; figures 1,2 * [A] 11 [Y] 2-4,8-10,12 [I] 6,7,13 | International search | [Y]US6554646 (CASEY DANIEL T [US]) [Y] 6 * ; Abstract, FIG. 20a, col. 8, In 7-23 *; | [Y]US2004020674 (MCFADDEN JEFF [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * ; Abstract, FIG. 1 a, para [0017], [0041] *; | [Y]US2010159829 (MCCORMACK GARY D [US]) [Y] 1-13 * ; Abstract, para [0028], [0029] *; | [Y]WO2010124165 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [US], et al) [Y] 5, 7, 8, 11-13 * ; Abstract, FIG. 1-3, 5, 13, para [0034]-[0037], [0039], [0043], [0048] and claim 20 *; | [Y]US2011057291 (SLUPSKY STEVEN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-13 * ; Abstract, FIG. 10, 12a, para [0018], [0019], [0021], [0025], [0091], [0094], [0095], [0096], [0107], [0113], [0122], [0123] *; | [A]US2011191480 (KOBAYASHI OSAMU [US]) [A] 1-13 * entire document *; | [AP]WO2013162844 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [AP] 1-13* ; entire document * |