EP3024996 - BLOCKING SYSTEM FOR ROLLER AWNINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.08.2017 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Master S.p.A. Via Sandro Pertini, 3 30030 Martellago (VE) / IT | [2016/28] |
Former [2016/22] | For all designated states Master S.p.A. Via S. Pertini, 3 30030 Martellago (VE) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE PAZZI, Renato Via Pittarini 59/9 I-35010 San Pietro in Gù (PD) / IT | 02 /
DE PAZZI, Paolo Via dei Salici 56 I-30036 Santa Maria di Sala (VE) / IT | 03 /
GUZZO, Damiano Via Cà Rubaldi 9/c I-30030 Oriago di Mira (VE) / IT | [2016/22] | Representative(s) | Cercenà, Alice, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna, 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [2016/22] | Application number, filing date | 14747726.9 | 18.07.2014 | [2016/22] | WO2014IB63225 | Priority number, date | IT2013PN00042 | 25.07.2013 Original published format: IT PN20130042 | [2016/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015011622 | Date: | 29.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3024996 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3024996 | Date: | 05.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E04F10/06, E06B9/90 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
E06B9/90 (EP);
E04F10/0607 (EP);
E04F10/0655 (EP);
E06B2009/805 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPERRSYSTEM FÜR ROLLENMARKISEN | [2016/22] | English: | BLOCKING SYSTEM FOR ROLLER AWNINGS | [2016/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE BLOCAGE POUR STORES ROULANTS | [2016/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/22] | 16.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2014 | AL | 05.10.2016 | AT | 05.10.2016 | BE | 05.10.2016 | CY | 05.10.2016 | CZ | 05.10.2016 | DK | 05.10.2016 | EE | 05.10.2016 | ES | 05.10.2016 | FI | 05.10.2016 | HR | 05.10.2016 | LT | 05.10.2016 | LV | 05.10.2016 | MC | 05.10.2016 | MK | 05.10.2016 | NL | 05.10.2016 | PL | 05.10.2016 | RO | 05.10.2016 | RS | 05.10.2016 | SE | 05.10.2016 | SI | 05.10.2016 | SK | 05.10.2016 | SM | 05.10.2016 | TR | 05.10.2016 | BG | 05.01.2017 | NO | 05.01.2017 | GR | 06.01.2017 | IS | 05.02.2017 | PT | 06.02.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.07.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
TR | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 18.07.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
MK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 18.07.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CY | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.07.2014 | |
AT | 05.10.2016 | ||
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
MC | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SI | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
BG | 05.01.2017 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
SM | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
EE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RO | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
SK | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
DK | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 05.10.2016 | |
BE | 05.10.2016 | ||
ES | 05.10.2016 | ||
FI | 05.10.2016 | ||
HR | 05.10.2016 | ||
LT | 05.10.2016 | ||
LV | 05.10.2016 | ||
NL | 05.10.2016 | ||
PL | 05.10.2016 | ||
RS | 05.10.2016 | ||
SE | 05.10.2016 | ||
NO | 05.01.2017 | ||
GR | 06.01.2017 | ||
IS | 05.02.2017 | ||
PT | 06.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 05.10.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0092122 (GRASHEI F ALUKON KG [DE]); | [A]US2002117269 (RAFFL KURT [IT]); | [A]EP1577458 (LLAZA SA [ES]); | [X]WO2013067549 (RITE HITE HOLDING CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | US2002117269 | WO2013067549 |