Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018049961 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715803064 | 03.11.2017 | WO2014JP68652 | 08.07.2014 | US201414902893 | 08.07.2014 | JP2013143329 | 09.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016143824 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP68652 | 08.07.2014 | JP2013143329 | 09.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016523808 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP68652 | 08.07.2014 | JP2013143329 | 09.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105228588 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP68652 | 08.07.2014 | JP2013143329 | 09.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3019146 | Global Dossier | 22.08.2018 | B1 | EP3019146 | 18.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014JP68652 | 08.07.2014 | JP2013143329 | 09.07.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015005490 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013143329 | 09.07.2013 |