|
05.01.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.01.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
20.10.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
02.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2020 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
03.06.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
62 |
|
03.05.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.10.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2018 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.02.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.09.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2016 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
22.12.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
13 |
|
14.12.2015 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.12.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
14.12.2015 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
14.12.2015 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.08.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.08.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.08.2015 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
26.06.2015 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Notification of transmittal of demand to the competent IPEA |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
05.06.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
05.06.2015 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.06.2015 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
24.02.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
76 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
66 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.11.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.10.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
44 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |