EP3027566 - MELTER HAVING A SUBMERGED COMBUSTION BURNER, METHOD USING THE BURNER AND USE OF THE BURNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Insulation Rue de Maestricht 95 4600 Visé / BE | [2016/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMOTT, Jerry c/o ARC-IP Sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 B-1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | 02 /
MAROLT, Bostjan c/o ARC-IP Sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 B-1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | 03 /
ETZKORN, Randy c/o ARC-IP Sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 B-1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | 04 /
DUCARME, David c/o ARC-IP Sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 B-1435 Mont Saint Guibert / BE | [2016/23] | Representative(s) | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/13] | ARC-IP ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui 4 1435 Mont Saint-Guibert / BE | ||
Former [2016/23] | Farmer, Guy Dominic ARC-IP sprl Rue Emile Francqui, 4 1435 Mont-Saint-Guibert / BE | Application number, filing date | 14749750.7 | 30.07.2014 | [2016/23] | WO2014EP66442 | Priority number, date | GB20130013652 | 31.07.2013 Original published format: GB 201313652 | [2016/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015014919 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3027566 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3027566 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/235, C03B5/12, F23D14/20, F23C3/00, F27B1/08 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
C03B5/2356 (EP,US);
C03B5/12 (EP,US);
C03B5/44 (EP,US);
F23C3/004 (EP,US);
F23D14/20 (EP,US);
F23D14/22 (US);
C03B2211/22 (EP,US);
C03B2211/23 (US);
C03B2211/70 (EP,US);
Y02P40/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/23] | Extension states | BA | 29.02.2016 | ME | 29.02.2016 | Title | German: | SCHMELZOFEN MIT EINEM TAUCHBRENNER, VERFAHREN MIT DEM BRENNER UND VERWENDUNG DES BRENNERS | [2016/23] | English: | MELTER HAVING A SUBMERGED COMBUSTION BURNER, METHOD USING THE BURNER AND USE OF THE BURNER | [2016/23] | French: | COMPARTIMENT DE FUSION COMPRENANT UN BRÛLEUR À COMBUSTION IMMERGÉ, PROCÉDÉ FAISANT APPEL AU BRÛLEUR ET UTILISATION DU BRÛLEUR | [2016/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/23] | 08.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2014 | AL | 28.03.2018 | AT | 28.03.2018 | CY | 28.03.2018 | EE | 28.03.2018 | LT | 28.03.2018 | MC | 28.03.2018 | MK | 28.03.2018 | RO | 28.03.2018 | RS | 28.03.2018 | SI | 28.03.2018 | SM | 28.03.2018 | BG | 28.06.2018 | NO | 28.06.2018 | GR | 29.06.2018 | IS | 28.07.2018 | IE | 30.07.2018 | MT | 30.07.2018 | PT | 30.07.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
CY | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
MK | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.07.2018 | ||
MT | 30.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.07.2014 | |
AL | 28.03.2018 | ||
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.07.2018 | ||
MT | 30.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.07.2018 | ||
MT | 30.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 30.07.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SI | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
MC | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
AT | 28.03.2018 | ||
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
PT | 30.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
SM | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
EE | 28.03.2018 | ||
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RO | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 28.03.2018 | |
LT | 28.03.2018 | ||
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | LT | 28.03.2018 | |
RS | 28.03.2018 | ||
BG | 28.06.2018 | ||
NO | 28.06.2018 | ||
GR | 29.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | LT | 28.03.2018 | |
NO | 28.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3260587 (DOLF HANS R, et al) [A] 1,11,13 * column 2, lines 13-49; figure 3 *; | [A]US4622007 (GITMAN GRIGORY M [US]) [A] 1,11,13 * abstract *; | [A]WO8707591 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]) [A] 1,11,13 * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 11; figure 2; claim 10 *; | [A]US5062789 (GITMAN GREGORY M [US]) [A] 1,11,13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2837916 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [A] 1,11,13* abstract *; | [A]EP0970021 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR]) [A] 1,11,13 * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0083] - [0087]; figures 5A,5B *; | [A]US2005236747 (RUE DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1,11,13 * paragraphs [0020] - [0024] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008184919 (D AGOSTINI MARK DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1,11,13 * abstract *; | [A]JP2012096942 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1,11,13 * abstract *; | [AP]WO2014008046 (JOHNS MANVILLE [US]) [AP] 1,11,13 * paragraphs [0053] - [0063]; figures 7-8B *; | [AP]WO2014085361 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [AP] 1,11,13 * paragraphs [0024] - [0027]; figures 1-6 * |