EP3039283 - FUEL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUENDERHAUF, Gerhard Bertha-Benz-Weg 2 75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | 02 /
KOENINGER, Andreas Am Wolfsbaum 17 75245 Neulingen-Goebrichen / DE | [2016/27] | Application number, filing date | 14749777.0 | 05.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014EP66770 | Priority number, date | DE201310217371 | 30.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013217371 | [2016/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015028261 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039283 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F02M61/06, F02M61/18 | [2016/27] | CPC: |
F02M61/06 (EP,KR,US);
B05B1/14 (US);
B05B1/1672 (US);
B05B1/3013 (US);
F02M61/18 (US);
F02M61/1806 (US);
F02M61/182 (EP,KR,US);
F02M61/1886 (EP,KR,US);
F02M61/1893 (EP,KR,US);
F02M61/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Title | German: | KRAFTSTOFFINJEKTOR | [2016/27] | English: | FUEL INJECTOR | [2016/27] | French: | INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT | [2016/27] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/33] | 19.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1190361 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG) [A] 1-6,10,11 * page 3, column l; figure 1 *; | [XI]DE2803774 (AUDI AG) [X] 1,5,7,11 * figure - * [I] 2-4,6,8-10; | [A]DE10207189 (FEV MOTORENTECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6,10,11 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028]; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1283336 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5,7-11 * paragraph [0073]; figures 15,16 *; | [A]WO2011033036 (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,10,11* page 10, lines 6-16; figure 2 * | Examination | US3559892 | JP2002322957 |