EP3021991 - COLD-ROLLED NARROW STRIP IN THE FORM OF FLAT WIRE OR PROFILED ELEMENTS MADE OF A HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL FOR USE IN FLEXIBLE PIPES, IN PARTICULAR IN FLEXIBLE PIPES FOR OFFSHORE APPLICATIONS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH COLD-ROLLED NARROW STRIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.D. Wälzholz GmbH Feldmühlenstrase 55 58093 Hagen / DE | [2016/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNIUS, Hans-Toni Bürenbruch 69 58239 Schwerte / DE | 02 /
BUDDENBERG, Heino Von-der-Recke-Strasse 88 58300 Wetter / DE | 03 /
BRACHTHÄUSER, Norbert Salbeiweg 14 44869 Bochum / DE | 04 /
WILMES, Dirk Taigelbrand 1 58640 Iserlohn / DE | [2016/21] | Representative(s) | Schneider, Uwe Patentanwalt Holbeinstrasse 27 59423 Unna / DE | [2016/21] | Application number, filing date | 14750684.4 | 16.07.2014 | [2016/21] | WO2014DE00370 | Priority number, date | DE20131012118 | 18.07.2013 Original published format: DE102013012118 | [2016/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015007265 | Date: | 22.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3021991 | Date: | 25.05.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3021991 | Date: | 18.03.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B21C1/00, B22D7/00, C21D6/00, C21D8/02, C21D8/06, C21D9/08, C22C38/04, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, C22C38/06, C22C38/00, C22C38/48, C22C38/58, C22C38/18, F16L11/08, C21D9/14, C21D9/52, C21D1/22, C21D1/25, C21D1/30 | [2019/47] | CPC: |
C22C38/06 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,CN,US);
F16L11/10 (US);
B21B1/16 (US);
B21B1/22 (US);
B21C1/003 (EP,US);
B22D7/00 (EP,US);
C21D1/25 (EP,US);
C21D1/30 (EP,CN,US);
C21D6/004 (EP,US);
C21D6/005 (EP,US);
C21D6/008 (EP,US);
C21D8/0205 (EP,US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/0236 (EP,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP,US);
C21D8/0273 (EP,US);
C21D8/065 (EP,CN,US);
C21D9/08 (EP,US);
C21D9/14 (EP,US);
C21D9/52 (EP,US);
C21D9/525 (EP,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/14 (CN);
C22C38/16 (CN);
C22C38/18 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/20 (EP,US);
C22C38/22 (EP,US);
C22C38/24 (EP,US);
C22C38/26 (EP,US);
C22C38/28 (EP,US);
C22C38/32 (EP,CN,US);
C22C38/40 (EP,US);
C22C38/46 (EP,US);
C22C38/48 (EP,US);
C22C38/58 (EP,US);
F16L11/24 (US);
B21B2001/221 (US);
B21B2001/225 (US);
C21D1/22 (EP,US);
C21D2211/001 (EP,CN,US);
F16L11/083 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T428/12951 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12972 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12979 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/21] | B21C37/04, B21C1/02, B22D11/124, C21D1/22, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/08, C22C38/12, F16L11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALTGEWALZTES SCHMALBAND IN FORM VON FLACHDRAHT ODER PROFILEN AUS EINEM HOCHFESTEN STAHL FÜR DEN EINSATZ IN FLEXIBLEN ROHREN, INSBESONDERE IN FLEXIBLEN ROHREN FÜR OFFSHORE-ANWENDUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERARTIGER KALTGEWALZTER SCHMALBÄNDER | [2016/21] | English: | COLD-ROLLED NARROW STRIP IN THE FORM OF FLAT WIRE OR PROFILED ELEMENTS MADE OF A HIGH-STRENGTH STEEL FOR USE IN FLEXIBLE PIPES, IN PARTICULAR IN FLEXIBLE PIPES FOR OFFSHORE APPLICATIONS, AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH COLD-ROLLED NARROW STRIPS | [2016/21] | French: | FEUILLARD LAMINÉ À FROID SOUS FORME DE FIL PLAT OU DE PROFILÉS EN ACIER À HAUTE RÉSISTANCE DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS DANS DES TUYAUX SOUPLES, EN PARTICULIER DES TUYAUX SOUPLES POUR APPLICATIONS OFFSHORE, AINSI QUE PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TELS FEUILLARDS LAMINÉS À FROID | [2016/21] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 31.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 19.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2014 | AL | 18.03.2020 | CY | 18.03.2020 | CZ | 18.03.2020 | EE | 18.03.2020 | ES | 18.03.2020 | FI | 18.03.2020 | HR | 18.03.2020 | IT | 18.03.2020 | LT | 18.03.2020 | LV | 18.03.2020 | MC | 18.03.2020 | MK | 18.03.2020 | MT | 18.03.2020 | NL | 18.03.2020 | PL | 18.03.2020 | RO | 18.03.2020 | RS | 18.03.2020 | SE | 18.03.2020 | SI | 18.03.2020 | SK | 18.03.2020 | SM | 18.03.2020 | TR | 18.03.2020 | BG | 18.06.2020 | NO | 18.06.2020 | GR | 19.06.2020 | AT | 16.07.2020 | IE | 16.07.2020 | LU | 16.07.2020 | IS | 18.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
AL | 18.03.2020 | ||
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
AT | 16.07.2020 | ||
IE | 16.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 18.03.2020 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2020 | ||
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
MT | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
TR | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
AT | 16.07.2020 | ||
IE | 16.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
AT | 16.07.2020 | ||
IE | 16.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IE | 16.07.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SI | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
LU | 16.07.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
MC | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
PL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
ES | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
IT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
EE | 18.03.2020 | ||
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 18.03.2020 | |
FI | 18.03.2020 | ||
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SK | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RO | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
SM | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
PT | 12.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LT | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
IS | 18.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
NL | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
BG | 18.06.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
GR | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
HR | 18.03.2020 | ||
LV | 18.03.2020 | ||
RS | 18.03.2020 | ||
SE | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 18.03.2020 | |
NO | 18.06.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004050442 (GLEJBOL KRISTIAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [A]WO2006050680 (C D WAELZHOLZ BROCKHAUS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2011120525 (NKT FLEXIBLES IS [DK], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [XDYI]EP2402472 (THYSSENKRUPP STEEL EUROPE AG [DE]) [XD] 1,2,6,7 * claims 1-12 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0 20] , [0 21] , [0 60] - [0070] * * tables 1, 2 * [Y] 8-11,24 [I] 3-5,12-23; | [YDA]WO2012171530 (NAT OILWELL VARCO DENMARK IS [DK], et al) [YD] 8-11,24 * page 1, line 2 - line 5 * * page 2, line 19 - line 19 * * page 15, line 14 - page 17, line 10 * * claims 1-16 * [A] 1-7,12-23 | by applicant | EP2402472 | WO2012171530 | WO2012171753 |