EP2956585 - MODULAR GLARE SCREEN SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.2018 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Louver Company 7700 Austin Avenue Skokie, IL 60077 / US | [2015/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUKEL, William, A. 3N47 Elizabeth Street Addison, IL 60101 / US | 02 /
CLARK, David, S. 27W253 Manchester Road Winfield, IL 60190 / US | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14751650.4 | 14.02.2014 | [2015/52] | WO2014US16412 | Priority number, date | US201361765168P | 15.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361765168 P | US201414180175 | 13.02.2014 Original published format: US201414180175 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014127205 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2956585 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2956585 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E01F7/06 | [2015/52] | CPC: |
E01F7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | 11.09.2015 | ME | 11.09.2015 | Title | German: | MODULARES BLENDUNGSABSCHIRMSYSTEM | [2015/52] | English: | MODULAR GLARE SCREEN SYSTEM | [2015/52] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCRAN ANTI-ÉBLOUISSEMENT MODULAIRE | [2015/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 23.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2014 | AL | 07.02.2018 | AT | 07.02.2018 | CY | 07.02.2018 | CZ | 07.02.2018 | DK | 07.02.2018 | EE | 07.02.2018 | ES | 07.02.2018 | FI | 07.02.2018 | HR | 07.02.2018 | IT | 07.02.2018 | LT | 07.02.2018 | LV | 07.02.2018 | MC | 07.02.2018 | MK | 07.02.2018 | NL | 07.02.2018 | PL | 07.02.2018 | PT | 07.02.2018 | RO | 07.02.2018 | RS | 07.02.2018 | SE | 07.02.2018 | SI | 07.02.2018 | SK | 07.02.2018 | SM | 07.02.2018 | TR | 07.02.2018 | IE | 14.02.2018 | LU | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | FR | 07.04.2018 | BG | 07.05.2018 | GB | 07.05.2018 | NO | 07.05.2018 | GR | 08.05.2018 | IS | 07.06.2018 | DE | 01.09.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 14.02.2014 | |
AL | 07.02.2018 | ||
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 07.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PT | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 07.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
TR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 07.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 07.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
FR | 07.04.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
GB | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SI | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
DE | 01.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
MC | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
SM | 07.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
DK | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.02.2018 | ||
EE | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RO | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
SK | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
IT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.02.2018 | |
AT | 07.02.2018 | ||
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
BG | 07.05.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.02.2018 | |
CY | 07.02.2018 | ||
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
LV | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
RS | 07.02.2018 | ||
SE | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
IS | 07.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
GR | 08.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
ES | 07.02.2018 | ||
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
PL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.02.2018 | |
FI | 07.02.2018 | ||
HR | 07.02.2018 | ||
LT | 07.02.2018 | ||
NL | 07.02.2018 | ||
NO | 07.05.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]FR2632991 (SODIREL DIFFUSION RGLE LOCALE [FR], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 1, lines 29-34 * * page 2, lines 3-25 * * page 3, line 35 - page 5, line 31 * * figures 1-5,8 * [A] 3-5 [I] 2,6,8,9; | [IA]FR2698893 (MASAIR [FR]) [I] 1 * page 1, line 13 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 30 * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 26 * * page 7, lines 7-18 * * figures 1,1A,3,5 * [A] 2-9; | [XA]US4338041 (SCHMANSKI DONALD W) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 5-13 * * column 2, lines 40-52 * * column 5, line 22 - column 6, line 13 * * figures 1,3,4,5b * [A] 2-9; | [A]GB1025653 (ALBERT STEPHEN JARVIS) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | International search | [XA]US7850317 (BLACKBURN ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-2, 5-9, 14-15, 18-19 * , entire document * [A] 3-4, 16-17, 20; | [XA]FR2632991 (SODIREL DIFFUSION RGLE LOCALE [FR], et al) [X] 10-12 * , entire document * [A] 13; | [A]US5190394 (MALLON RICHARD D [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]US4504168 (MILLER MICHAEL C [US]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document, especially Figure 15 *; | [A]JP3914343B (Naoki et al.) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]GB1025653 (ALBERT STEPHEN JARVIS) [A] 1-20 * , entire document *; | [A]FR2698893 (MASAIR [FR]) [A] 1-20 * , entire document * |