EP2957995 - INPUT DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2017 [2017/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UCHIKAWA, Tatsuya c/o NEC Mobile Communications, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | 02 /
YUNOKI, Kazuyuki c/o NEC Mobile Communications, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | 03 /
OKUMOTO, Takaaki c/o NEC Mobile Communications, Ltd. 1753 Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/52] | Application number, filing date | 14752231.2 | 15.01.2014 | [2015/52] | WO2014JP50571 | Priority number, date | JP20130025439 | 13.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013025439 | [2015/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014125857 | Date: | 21.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2957995 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/0354, G06F3/0488 | [2016/45] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
G06F3/03547 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/52] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Title | German: | EINGABEVORRICHTUNG UND STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE PROGRAMM | [2015/52] | English: | INPUT DEVICE AND CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR, AND PROGRAM | [2015/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRÉE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, ET PROGRAMME | [2015/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2015 | Translation filed | 15.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 15.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 09.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/44] | 19.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2270627 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] - [0055]; figures 1-9 *; | [XI]EP2075672 (HTC CORP [TW]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] - [0007] - [0010] - [0014] - [0017]; figure 1 * [I] 3,4,7,8; | [XI]EP2472365 (KYOCERA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * paragraphs [0014] - [0016] - [0031] , [0034] - [0046] - [0049] , [0055] - [0060] - [0075]; figures 1,3,7-14 * [I] 3,4,7,8; | [A]EP2101247 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 3,7 * paragraphs [0187] - [0191]; figure 20 *; | [A]US2012268412 (CRUZ-HERNANDEZ JUAN MANUEL [CA], et al) [A] 3,7 * paragraphs [0036] , [0058] * | International search | [X]JP2011048701 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2012249881 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC) | by applicant | JP2005258666 |