|
27.10.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
16.06.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
17.04.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.03.2020 |
Payment submission rejected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.2020 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2018 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2017 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2016 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2016 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.2016 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2016 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2016 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2016 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2016 |
Subsequently filed documents not duly signed |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.02.2016 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2016 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.09.2015 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.01.2015 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.10.2014 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
22 |
|
12.08.2014 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
9 |