EP2970762 - MULTI-LAYER-COATED QUANTUM DOT BEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanoco Technologies Ltd 46 Grafton Street Manchester M13 9NT / GB | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WERNER, Matthew 63 Southdale Road Liverpool L15 4HX / GB | 02 /
GRESTY, Nathalie 33 Maytree Avenue Vicars Cross Chester Cheshire CH3 5HG / GB | 03 /
PICKETT, Nigel 8a Barlow Moor Road Didsbury Manchester M20 6TR / GB | 04 /
CHALKER, Paul 8 Darmonds Green West Kirby Wirral CH48 5DU / GB | 05 /
HARRIS, James 174 Birchfields Road Manchester M14 6PE / GB | 06 /
NAASANI, Imad Flat 10 Block 3 Larke Rise Manchester M20 2UL / GB | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Dauncey, Mark Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Dauncey, Mark Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14752372.4 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014IB01257 | Priority number, date | US201361781323P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361781323 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014140936 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2970762 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C09K11/56, C09K11/70, H01L33/50 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
H01L33/502 (EP,US);
C09K11/025 (CN);
C09K11/00 (EP,US);
C09K11/02 (EP,US);
C09K11/08 (EP,US);
C09K11/565 (EP,US);
C09K11/70 (EP,US);
C09K11/703 (CN);
C23C16/30 (EP,US);
C23C16/40 (CN);
C23C16/403 (EP,US);
C23C16/4417 (EP,CN,US);
C23C16/442 (EP,CN,US);
C23C16/45525 (US);
C23C16/45527 (EP,CN,US);
C23C16/45531 (EP,US);
H01L31/035218 (US);
H01L33/56 (US);
B82Y30/00 (US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L29/12 (US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2933/0041 (US);
H01L2933/005 (US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | MEHRFACH BESCHICHTETE QUANTENPUNKT-BEADS | [2016/03] | English: | MULTI-LAYER-COATED QUANTUM DOT BEADS | [2016/03] | French: | BILLES DE POINTS QUANTIQUES PORTANT UN REVÊTEMENT MULTICOUCHE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/17] | 14.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDI]US2011068322 (PICKETT NIGEL [GB], et al) [XD] 1,13 * figures 7-10; examples 1-5; claims 1-30 * [I] 2-12,14-24; | [XDI]US2011068321 (PICKETT NIGEL [GB], et al) [XD] 1,13 * figures 7-14; examples 1-8; claims 1-39 * [I] 2-12,14-24; | [XI]US2010167011 (DUBROW ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1,13 * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0101]; figures 5-6; claims 1-89 * [I] 2-12,14-24 | by applicant | US2010123155 | US2011068321 | US2011068322 | US7803423 | US7588828 | US7867556 | US2011241229 | US2010113813 | - A.A. DAMERON; S.D. DAVIDSON; B.B. BURTON; P.F. CARCIA; R.S. MCLEAN; S.M. GEORGE, J. PHYS. CHEM. C, (2008), vol. 122, page 4573 | - A.A. DAMERON; D. SEGHETE; B.B. BURTON; S.D. DAVIDSON; A.S. CAVANAGH; J.A. BERTRAND; S.M. GEORGE, CHEM. MATER., (2008), vol. 20, page 3315 | - J. MATER. CHEM., (2012), vol. 22, page 20203 | - CHEM. VAPOR DEPOSITION, (2005), vol. 11, page 420 | - AM. CERAM. SOC., (2009), vol. 92, page 649 |