17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
10.08.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
27.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
01.09.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
07.08.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.07.2017 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 23.08.2017 [2017/34] |
30.06.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] |
07.06.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
18.05.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.05.2017 |
Change - inventor |
|
07.04.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
07.04.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.10.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.07.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.05.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.05.2016 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
25.03.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
10.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2016 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
19.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.01.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.01.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
18.01.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|