Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017269102 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | US201715487634 | 14.04.2017 | US201615287162 | 06.10.2016 | US201615013833 | 02.02.2016 | US201414453268 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9658236 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B2 | US2017023590 | 26.01.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | US201615287162 | 06.10.2016 | US201615013833 | 02.02.2016 | US201414453268 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9494601 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2016 | B2 | US2016154009 | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | US201615013833 | 02.02.2016 | US201414453268 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015079613 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | US201414453268 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12025621 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2024 | B2 | US2021285964 | 16.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US202117161783 | 29.01.2021 | US201715487634 | 14.04.2017 | US201615287162 | 06.10.2016 | US201615013833 | 02.02.2016 | US201414453268 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102448976B | Global Dossier | 29.09.2022 | B1 | KR20200066743 | 10.06.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | KR20187005614 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102192596B | Global Dossier | 18.12.2020 | B1 | KR20180026555 | 12.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101834469B | Global Dossier | 06.03.2018 | B1 | KR20160033230 | 25.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6211701B | Global Dossier | 11.10.2017 | B2 | JP2016528235 | 15.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL243653 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4300103 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | A3 | EP4300103 | 03.01.2024 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | EP14752744 | 06.08.2014 | EP17182174 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3290922 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | EP14752744 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105683759B | Global Dossier | 29.03.2019 | B | CN105683759 | 15.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2918959 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2024 | C | CA2918959 | 12.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014306002B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2017 | B2 | AU2014306002 | 18.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3011345 | Global Dossier | 04.10.2017 | B1 | EP3011345 | 27.04.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016002435 | 29.09.2020 | A8 | BR112016002435 | 12.09.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR122020019190 | 21.11.2023 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | BR112016002435 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA034870 | 31.03.2020 | B1 | EA201690346 | 31.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA202090129 | 31.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2650917T | 23.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1218443 | 17.02.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3011345T | 29.12.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | WO2014US49957 | 06.08.2014 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | EP14752744 | 06.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015021166 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2015 | A3 | WO2015021166 | 12.02.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7235709B | Global Dossier | 08.03.2023 | B2 | JP2021009162 | 28.01.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6798934B | Global Dossier | 09.12.2020 | B2 | JP2017142266 | 17.08.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361863299 | 07.08.2013 | US201361913180 | 06.12.2013 | Type | Divisional application | EP3290922 |