EP3035819 - SUPPORT DEVICE WITH VENTILATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/26] | CARRYING DEVICE COMPRISING QUASI-ACTIVE VENTILATION | ||
[2018/47] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2019 [2019/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 1a Event Services GmbH Köpenicker Str. 48/49e 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIRNBAUM, Gunter Köpenicker Straße 48/49e 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/26] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2016/26] | Application number, filing date | 14753106.5 | 21.08.2014 | [2016/26] | WO2014EP67862 | Priority number, date | DE201310109073 | 22.08.2013 Original published format: DE102013109073 | DE201410104787 | 03.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014104787 | [2016/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015025021 | Date: | 26.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3035819 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A45F3/04 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
A45F3/04 (EP);
A45F2003/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/26] | Title | German: | TRAGEEINRICHTUNG MIT QUASIAKTIVER BELÜFTUNG | [2016/26] | English: | SUPPORT DEVICE WITH VENTILATION SYSTEM | [2018/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT AVEC SYSTÈME DE VENTILATION | [2019/01] |
Former [2016/26] | CARRYING DEVICE COMPRISING QUASI-ACTIVE VENTILATION | ||
Former [2016/26] | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT À VENTILATION QUASI ACTIVE | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/26] | 02.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/41] | 24.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6325262 (THOMPSON JESSE B [US]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005017041 (ROBERTS BRIAN [CA]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]FR2984700 (DECATHLON SA [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]WO2006068072 (SEFT DEV LAB CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]GB398234 (CUTHBERT COLLINGWOOD) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2778824 (LAFUMA SA [FR]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]US2005035170 (SEARS JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * |