02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
17.06.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
17.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
12.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
27.10.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
20.10.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
20.10.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.10.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.09.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.08.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
25.08.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
21.07.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.10.2022 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] |
22.07.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.01.2022 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.09.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.09.2021 |
First examination report |
|
21.07.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.06.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.05.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
22.02.2019 |
Change: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
22.02.2019 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.08.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.08.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.10.2016 |
Change - extension states |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
03.08.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.05.2016 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
13.05.2016 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
30.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
23.02.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2016 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.09.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2015 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.08.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|