EP3030984 - ACCESS AND MANAGEMENT OF ENTITY-AUGMENTED CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKSELROD, Gregory c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
HARDY, Donald Gordon c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
CHILAKAMARRI, Pradeep c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
DESAI, Shikha Devesh c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
KOHLMEIER, Bernhard S.J. c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/24] | Application number, filing date | 14753419.2 | 06.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014US50007 | Priority number, date | US201361863241P | 07.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361863241 P | US201414319654 | 30.06.2014 Original published format: US201414319654 | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015021199 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3030984 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F17/27, G06Q10/10 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (US);
G06F16/908 (EP,US);
G06F16/9566 (US);
G06F3/0481 (US);
G06F40/295 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Title | German: | ZUGANG ZU UND VERWALTUNG VON ENTITÄTSERWEITERTEM INHALT | [2016/24] | English: | ACCESS AND MANAGEMENT OF ENTITY-AUGMENTED CONTENT | [2016/24] | French: | ACCÈS ET GESTION DE CONTENU ENRICHI PAR ENTITÉS | [2016/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.01.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 26.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.06.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/07] | 28.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2005138033 (KATTA ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6,8-14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0070] * [I] 2,3,5,7; | [A]US2005216454 (DIAB ALI [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10* the whole document *; | [XI]EP1843256 (BRITISH TELECMMUNICATIONS PUBL [GB]) [X] 1,6,10,11 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * [I] 2-5,7-9,12-14; | [A]US2008109832 (OZZIE RAYMOND E [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0037] *; | [A]US2012278080 (SINGH JASJIT [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2013173604 (LI KANG [US], et al) [A] 1,5,10 * the whole document * |