|
14.03.2022 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2021 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.12.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.02.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2020 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2019 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2019 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2019 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.08.2018 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2018 |
Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2017 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.07.2017 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2017 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2017 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2016 |
Reply to the invitation to clarify the claims/the subject matter of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2016 |
Invitation to indicate the claims and the subject-matter to be searched |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2015 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2015 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
06.10.2015 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2015 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Translation of the annexes to the International Preliminary Examination Report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.09.2015 |
Translation of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.09.2015 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2015 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2014 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.2014 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.08.2014 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
16 |