EP2959134 - AERATING FUEL INJECTOR SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2021/12] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | ||
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLANEY, Ken F. 72 Partridge Drive Middleton, New Hampshire 03887 / US | 02 /
KRAMER, Stephen K. 57R Washington Road Cromwell, Connecticut 06416 / US | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Gittins, Alex Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14754245.0 | 19.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014US17110 | Priority number, date | US201361766411P | 19.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361766411 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014130528 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959134 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/232, F02C7/22, F23R3/28, F23D11/10 | [2016/42] | CPC: |
F02C7/22 (EP,US);
F23R3/286 (US);
F23D11/10 (EP,US);
F23R3/28 (EP,US);
F05D2260/608 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | F02C7/232, F02C7/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | BELÜFTUNG EINES KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZSYSTEMS FÜR EINEN GASTURBINENMOTOR | [2016/01] | English: | AERATING FUEL INJECTOR SYSTEM FOR A GAS TURBINE ENGINE | [2016/01] | French: | AÉRATION D'UN SYSTÈME D'INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT POUR UNE TURBINE À GAZ | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 19.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/44] | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.09.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4628687 (STROEM SIGMUNN [NO]) [Y] 2,3,5,11,12,14 * column 2, line 17 - column 4, line 29 * * figure - *; | [A]US5587068 (AHO JR WILHO V [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** figure - *; | [X]US2004025490 (PAUL MARIUS A [US]) [X] 1,4,6-10,13 * paragraphs [0065] - [0164] * * figure - *; | [XY]US2011072823 (CHEN DAIH-YEOU [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-10,13 * paragraphs [0014] - [0023] * * figure - * [Y] 2,3,5,11,12,14 | International search | [Y]US4628687 (STROEM SIGMUNN [NO]); | [A]US5209066 (BARBIER GERARD Y G [FR], et al); | [A]US2006032231 (ANDERSSON STEFAN [SE], et al); | [X]US2011072823 (CHEN DAIH-YEOU [US], et al); | [A]US2011079013 (MEHRING CARSTEN RALF [US]) | by applicant | US2004025490 | US2011072823 |