EP2960270 - BIAXIALLY STRETCHED FILM, AND ETHYLENE-TYPE POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prime Polymer Co., Ltd. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIN, Keiko c/o PRIME POLYMER CO. LTD. 3 Chigusakaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0108 / JP | 02 /
TASAKI, Tsutomu c/o PRIME POLYMER CO. LTD. 5-2 Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7117 / JP | 03 /
KANAI, Toshitaka c/o IDEMITSU KOSAN CO. LTD. 2-1 Anesakikaigan Ichihara-shi Chiba 299-0107 / JP | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/51] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2016/01] | Raynor, Stuart Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14754789.7 | 19.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014JP53946 | Priority number, date | JP20130030927 | 20.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013030927 | [2016/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014129511 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2960270 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2960270 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08F210/16, C08L23/08 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
B29C55/143 (EP,US);
B29K2023/08 (EP,US);
C08J2323/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L23/06 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/26 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIAXIAL GESTRECKTE FOLIE UND ETHYLENPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2016/01] | English: | BIAXIALLY STRETCHED FILM, AND ETHYLENE-TYPE POLYMER COMPOSITION | [2016/01] | French: | FILM ÉTIRÉ DE FAÇON BIAXIALE, ET COMPOSITION DE POLYMÈRE DE TYPE ÉTHYLÈNE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2015 | Translation filed | 25.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 18.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2014 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | IE | 19.02.2018 | MT | 19.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.02.2014 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
MT | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 19.02.2014 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
MT | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
MT | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
MT | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008016059 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [X] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2008031385 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al) [X] 4-6 * the whole document *; | [E]EP2799486 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [E] 4-6* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO2007094378 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [X]WO2008016059 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al); | [X]JP2008031385 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [A]JP2008031386 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [A]JP2009197225 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [A]JP2009197226 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al) | by applicant | JPS57181828 | JPS5890924 | JPH01501950 | JPH03179005 | JPH03179006 | JPH03207703 | JPH03207704 | JPH052036 | US5321106 | JPH08269270 | JP2005298642 | WO2006080578 | JP2006233207 | WO2007034920 | JP2007177168 | JP2007197722 | JP2008031385 | JP2011001545 | - WALTER KAMINSKY, MAKROMOL.CHEM., (1992), vol. 193, page 606 | - ZENJIRO OSAWA ET AL., Koubunshi no Jumyou Yosoku to Choujumyouka Gijutsu, NTS INC., (2002), page 481 | - RYOUIKI ZOUKAN, NMR-SOUSETSU TO JIKKEN GUIDE [I}, vol. 141, pages 132 - 133 | - C. GABRIEL; H. MUNSTEDT, J. RHEOL., (2003), vol. 47, no. 3, page 619 | - H. MUNSTEDT; D. AUHL, J. NON-NEWTONIAN FLUID MECH., (2005), pages 128,62 - 69 | - KAZUO MATSUURA ET AL., Polyethylene Gijutsu Dokuhon, KOGYO CHOSAKAI PUBLISHING CO., LTD., (2001), page 32,36 | - WALTHER BURCHARD, "Branched Polymer II", ADVANCES IN POLYMER SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 143, page 137 | - R. CHIANG, J. POLYM. SCI., (1959), vol. 36, no. 91, page 94 | - R. CHIANG, J. POLYM. SCI., (1958), vol. 28, no. 235, page 237 | - A. S. HOFFMAN; B. A. FRIES; P. C. CONDIT, J. POLYM. SCI., (1963), vol. 109, page 119 | - "Kagaku Ryouiki Zoukan", NMR-SOUSETSU TO JIKKEN GUIDE [I], vol. 141, page 132,133 |