Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020002490 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916565583 | 10.09.2019 | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | US201514768848 | 19.08.2015 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10457786 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2019 | B2 | US2015376358 | 31.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2014129511 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2017 | A1 | JP6000439B | 28.09.2016 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105008439B | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B | CN105008439 | 28.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2960270 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2017 | B1 | EP2960270 | 13.07.2016 | A4 | EP2960270 | 30.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2659232T | 14.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2960270T | 30.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | EP14754789 | 19.02.2014 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201506544U | 29.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | WO2014JP53946 | 19.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014129511 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2960270T | 07.02.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | JP2013030927 | 20.02.2013 |