EP2959892 - ENTERIC COATED TABLET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeria Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 10-11, Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8351 / JP | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RYU, Akio c/o Zeria Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 10-11 Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8351 / JP | 02 /
OSADA, Miyako c/o Zeria Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 10-11 Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8351 / JP | [2020/37] |
Former [2016/01] | 01 /
RYU, Akio c/o Zeria Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 10-11 Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8351 / JP | ||
02 /
OSADA, Miyako c/o Zeria Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. 10-11 Nihonbashi Kobuna-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8351 / JP | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstraße 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14754975.2 | 21.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014JP54104 | Priority number, date | JP20130032759 | 22.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013032759 | [2016/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014129568 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959892 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2959892 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.08.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/28, A61K9/32, A61K9/36, A61K31/606, A61P1/04 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
A61K9/2846 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/196 (IL,RU);
A61K9/2886 (EP,IL,RU,US);
A61K31/606 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/32 (IL,RU);
A61K47/38 (IL,RU);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | A61K9/36, A61K31/606, A61K45/00, A61K47/32, A61K47/38, A61P1/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAGENSAFTRESISTENTE TABLETTE | [2016/01] | English: | ENTERIC COATED TABLET | [2016/01] | French: | COMPRIMÉ ENROBÉ GASTRO-RÉSISTANT | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2015 | Translation filed | 25.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 25.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2021
10.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH Opponent's representative dsm-firmenich IP Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2021
10.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH Opponent's representative dsm-firmenich IP DSM-Firmenich AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2021/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.06.2021
10.06.2021
ADMISSIBLE DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH Opponent's representative Kurt, Manfred DSM Nutritional Products AG Patent Department Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 23.06.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.10.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.12.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 10.02.2023 | Appeal received No. T0271/23 | 10.02.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 11.04.2023 | Statement of grounds filed | 16.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2022/07] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS58109413 (EISAI CO LTD); | JP2003501458 [ ]; | [XY]WO03045356 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [Y]US6773720 (VILLA ROBERTO [PA], et al); | [Y]WO2009047802 (LUPIN LTD [IN], et al); | [Y]US2009162434 (UGWOKE MICHAEL I [NL], et al); | [I]US2010129446 (LIU FANG [GB], et al); | JP2011500553 [ ]; | [Y]WO2012028698 (DISPHAR INT BV [NL], et al); | [XP]WO2013164316 (TILLOTTS PHARMA AG [CH]) | International search | [A]JPS58109413 (EISAI CO LTD); | [A]JP2003501458 ; | [A]US2009162434 (UGWOKE MICHAEL I [NL], et al); | [A]JP2011500553 ; | [A]WO2011012990 (METHYLATION SCIENCES INTERNAT SRL [BB], et al); | [A]WO2012028698 (DISPHAR INT BV [NL], et al) | by applicant | JP2001502333 | JP2005510539 | Opposition | WO03045356 | WO2005051346 | US2009162434 |