EP3044608 - LOCATING DEVICE FOR LOCATING TRANSMITTERS OR OBJECTS CONNECTED TO TRANSMITTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sarissa GmbH Ettishofer Strasse 8 88250 Weingarten / DE | [2016/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODE, Reinhard Siebenbürgenstrasse 103 74081 Heilbronn / DE | 02 /
JAUCH, Volker Panoramastrasse 44 88255 Baienfurt / DE | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 14755629.4 | 18.08.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014EP67532 | Priority number, date | DE20131015050 | 12.09.2013 Original published format: DE102013015050 | [2016/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015036202 | Date: | 19.03.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044608 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3044608 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01S11/14, G01S5/30 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
G01S11/14 (EP);
G01S5/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORTUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM ORTEN VON SENDERN ODER MIT SENDERN VERBUNDENEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2016/29] | English: | LOCATING DEVICE FOR LOCATING TRANSMITTERS OR OBJECTS CONNECTED TO TRANSMITTERS | [2016/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LOCALISATION D'ÉMETTEURS OU D'OBJETS RELIÉS À DES ÉMETTEURS | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 28.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2014 | AL | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | DK | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | ES | 11.11.2020 | FI | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | IT | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | NL | 11.11.2020 | PL | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SI | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | TR | 11.11.2020 | BG | 11.02.2021 | NO | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | PT | 11.03.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 18.08.2014 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
TR | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 18.08.2014 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 18.08.2014 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 18.08.2014 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 11.11.2020 | |
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 11.11.2020 | |
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 11.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08226810 (HAZAMA GUMI, et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO0166201 (CAIROS TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1426784 (RUAG ELECTRONICS [CH]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009154294 (JEONG HYUK [KR], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2009126416 (CISCO TECH INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]WO2013108243 (WEISMAN ISRAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |