EP3183396 - EDGE PROFILE ELEMENT FOR A CEILING SUBSTRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MT, TR | published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knauf Gips KG Am Bahnhof 7 97346 Iphofen / DE | [2017/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMONIC, Boris Senjskih uskoka 3 51000 Rijeka / HR | 02 /
NYC, Miroslav Lhotská 2202 19300 Praha 9 / CZ | 03 /
VIEBAHN, Michael Ludwigstrasse 5 97346 Iphofen / DE | [2017/26] | Representative(s) | Zech, Stefan Markus Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2017/26] | Application number, filing date | 14755637.7 | 19.08.2014 | [2017/26] | WO2014EP67615 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016026515 | Date: | 25.02.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3183396 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3183396 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | E04B9/12, E04B9/30 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
E04B9/125 (EP);
E04B9/30 (EP);
E04B9/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/26] | Extension states | BA | 21.02.2017 | ME | 21.02.2017 | Title | German: | RANDPROFILELEMENT FÜR EINE DECKENUNTERKONSTRUKTION | [2017/26] | English: | EDGE PROFILE ELEMENT FOR A CEILING SUBSTRUCTURE | [2017/26] | French: | ÉLÉMENT PROFILÉ DE BORD POUR SOUS-STRUCTURE DE PLAFOND | [2017/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/26] | 21.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.02.2019 | 31.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | TR | 09.10.2019 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/18] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3321882 (STAHLHUT LEO G) [A] 9-14* figures 1, 6, 9 *; | [XI]JPS5469625U (N.A.) [X] 1 * figure 3 * [I] 8; | [XI]JPH09105200 (NIPPON KAGAKU SANGYO KK) [X] 1-4,14 * figure 9 * [I] 5-7,9,12; | [XI]JP2000336873 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [X] 1-4,14 * figures 1, 4a * [I] 5-7 |