EP3063511 - DEVICE FOR DETERMINING OR MONITORING THE FILL LEVEL OF A MEDIUM IN A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.12.2021 [2021/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser SE+Co. KG Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | [2018/15] |
Former [2016/36] | For all designated states Endress + Hauser GmbH + Co. KG. Hauptstrasse 1 79689 Maulburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLÖDT, Thomas Ackerstr. 53 CH-4057 Basel / CH | 02 /
KLÖFER, Peter Marktstr. 8/1 79585 Steinen / DE | [2016/36] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/36] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 14755827.4 | 28.08.2014 | [2016/36] | WO2014EP68206 | Priority number, date | DE201310112025 | 31.10.2013 Original published format: DE102013112025 | [2016/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015062765 | Date: | 07.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3063511 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/284 | [2016/36] | CPC: |
G01F23/284 (EP,US);
G01F15/063 (EP,US);
G01F23/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG ODER ÜBERWACHUNG DES FÜLLSTANDS EINES MEDIUMS IN EINEM BEHÄLTER | [2016/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETERMINING OR MONITORING THE FILL LEVEL OF A MEDIUM IN A CONTAINER | [2016/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION OU DE SURVEILLANCE DU NIVEAU DE REMPLISSAGE D'UN FLUIDE DANS UN RÉSERVOIR | [2016/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 08.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/50] | 11.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE19934041 (SCHERNUS WINFRIED [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,11 * column 2, line 41 - line 56 * * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 6 * * column 9, line 6 - line 41 * * column 9, line 42 - line 63 * * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 8 * * column 10, line 36 - line 63 * * column 10, line 64 - column 11, line 27 * * figures 6-10 * [Y] 4,5,9; | [Y]DE19644777 (SICAN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 9 * column 4, line 18 - line 41 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]US2012227484 (CHEN YE [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0080] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 1-4,7,8 * * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0123] *; | [X]EP1321564 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1-3,9,11 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1,2,3,5 *; | [YA]DE19901814 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 5 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6-9; | [A]DE4204212 (WITTKOWSKI HANS [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]RU2002123064 (SOVLUKOV A S) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102008031783 (IDENT TECHNOLOGY AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | US2008184795 | US2012266689 | by applicant | DE102012104075 |