Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9938972 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2018 | B2 | US2016186750 | 30.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 | WO2014GB52523 | 18.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105492773B | Global Dossier | 04.05.2018 | B | CN105492773 | 13.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 | WO2014GB52523 | 18.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2956023 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2021 | C | CA2956023 | 26.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 | WO2014GB52523 | 18.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014310464B | Global Dossier | 18.01.2018 | B2 | AU2014310464 | 10.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 | WO2014GB52523 | 18.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3030785 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2019 | B1 | EP3030785 | 15.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 | WO2014GB52523 | 18.08.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2768373T | 22.06.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 | WO2014GB52523 | 18.08.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015025140 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB201314774D0 | 02.10.2013 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB201314774 | 19.08.2013 |