EP2835943 - SERVICE PROCESS CONTROL METHOD AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2016/38] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASSON, Uri Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
TANG, Shengjun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HE, Jun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2015/18] |
Former [2015/07] | 01 /
URI, Hasson Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
02 /
TANG, Shengjun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | |||
03 /
HE, Jun Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14755964.5 | 20.01.2014 | [2016/38] | WO2014CN70910 | Priority number, date | CN201310216184 | 03.06.2013 Original published format: CN201310216184 | [2015/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014194677 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | ZH | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2835943 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2835943 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.12.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/851, H04L12/24, H04L12/931, H04L12/26, H04L29/06 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H04L49/20 (EP,KR,US);
H04L41/0894 (EP,KR,RU);
H04L69/22 (US);
H04L41/0893 (US);
H04L43/028 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04L45/74 (US);
H04L47/20 (US);
H04L47/50 (KR);
H04L69/324 (KR,RU,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/22] | H04L12/851, H04L12/24, H04L12/931 | ||
Former IPC [2015/07] | H04L12/851 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR DIENSTLEISTUNGSPROZESS UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2015/07] | English: | SERVICE PROCESS CONTROL METHOD AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2015/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PROCESSUS DE SERVICE ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2015/07] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2014 | Translation filed | 04.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 12.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16178521.7 / EP3174256 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.01.2014 | AL | 21.09.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SE | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | TR | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IE | 20.01.2017 | LU | 20.01.2017 | MT | 20.01.2017 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
TR | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
MT | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
MT | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
MT | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 20.01.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
MT | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.09.2016 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
MT | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
MT | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IE | 20.01.2017 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
LU | 20.01.2017 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SE | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2001039576 (KANADA YASUSI [JP]) [I] 1-11 * figures 1,2,3a,3b,4a,4b,19,27 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0102] * * paragraph [0138] - paragraph [0139] * * paragraph [0187] *; | [A]US2013094507 (BREBNER GORDON J [US]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] *; | [E]US2014156823 (LIU HEWEI [CN], et al) [E] 1,7 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0005] *; | [E]WO2014085952 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [E] 1,7 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0005] * | International search | [A]CN101022539 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-11 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN101119321 (H3C TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-11* , the whole document *; | [A]CN101409885 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP FUJIAN CO [CN]) [A] 1-11 * , the whole document *; | [A]CN102665191 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * , the whole document *; | [PX]CN103346974 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [PX] 1-11 * , claims 1-11 * |