EP3030171 - INJECTION DEVICE FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE PROCEDURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/24] | INJECTION DEVICE FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE PROCEDURES AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2017/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Bio Therapeutics, Inc. 4370 La Jolla Village Drive Suite 400 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2016/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CABRERA AQUINO, Jose Gustavo Cerrada De Guadalajara No. 4 Casa 7 Del. Tlalpan C.P. 14260 Mexico D.F. / MX | 02 /
SEGURA PACHECO, Blanca Angelica Retorno 8 De Fray Servando 10 Col. Jardin Balbuena C.P. 18900 Mexico D.F. / MX | 03 /
GERKEN, Steven 202 Lindsey Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 04 /
MASTERSON, Steven 229 Hillcrest Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2017/44] |
Former [2017/40] | 01 /
CABRERA AQUINO, Jose Gustavo Cerrada De Guadalajara No. 4 Casa 7 14260 Del. Tlalpan C.P. 14260 Mexico D.F. / MX | ||
02 /
SEGURA PACHECO, Blanca Angelica Retorno 8 De Fray Servando 10 Col. Jardin Balbuena C.P. 18900 Mexico D.F. / MX | |||
03 /
GERKEN, Steven 202 Lindsey Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
04 /
MASTERSON, Steven 229 Hillcrest Drive Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
Former [2016/24] | 01 /
CABRERA AQUINO, Jose Gustavo Cerrada De Guadalajara No. 4 Casa 7 14260 Thalpan / MX | ||
02 /
SEGURA PACHECO, Blanca Angelica Retorno 8 De Fray Servando 10 Col. Jardin Balbuena C.P. 18900 Mexico D.F. / MX | |||
03 /
GERKEN, Steven 202 Lindsey Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | |||
04 /
MASTERSON, Steven 1350 Specialty Drive, Suite A Vista, CA 92081 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/24] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14756174.0 | 08.08.2014 | [2016/24] | WO2014US50446 | Priority number, date | US201361863888P | 08.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361863888 P | [2016/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015021448 | Date: | 12.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3030171 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3030171 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61M5/178 | [2016/24] | CPC: |
A61B17/3478 (EP,EA,US);
A61M5/31511 (EP,EA,US);
A61M5/46 (EA,US);
A61D7/00 (EP,EA,US);
A61M5/3202 (EA,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/14 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A61B2017/00247 (EP,EA,US);
A61B2090/034 (EP,EA,US);
A61B2090/08021 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2005/31598 (EA,US);
A61M2202/206 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/02 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/04 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/0693 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/1003 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/1039 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/1071 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/1089 (EP,EA,US);
A61M2210/125 (EP,EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/24] | Extension states | BA | 05.02.2016 | ME | 05.02.2016 | Title | German: | INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MINIMAL INVASIVE EINGRIFFE | [2017/20] | English: | INJECTION DEVICE FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE PROCEDURES | [2017/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION POUR INTERVENTIONS PEU INVASIVES | [2017/20] |
Former [2016/24] | INJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MINIMAL INVASIVE EINGRIFFE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | ||
Former [2016/24] | INJECTION DEVICE FOR MINIMALLY INVASIVE PROCEDURES AND USES THEREOF | ||
Former [2016/24] | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION POUR INTERVENTIONS PEU INVASIVES ET SES UTILISATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/24] | 15.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.08.2014 | AL | 01.11.2017 | AT | 01.11.2017 | CY | 01.11.2017 | CZ | 01.11.2017 | DK | 01.11.2017 | EE | 01.11.2017 | FI | 01.11.2017 | HR | 01.11.2017 | LT | 01.11.2017 | LV | 01.11.2017 | MC | 01.11.2017 | MK | 01.11.2017 | PL | 01.11.2017 | PT | 01.11.2017 | RO | 01.11.2017 | RS | 01.11.2017 | SE | 01.11.2017 | SI | 01.11.2017 | SK | 01.11.2017 | SM | 01.11.2017 | BG | 01.02.2018 | NO | 01.02.2018 | GR | 02.02.2018 | IS | 01.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 08.08.2014 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
MK | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.08.2014 | |
AT | 01.11.2017 | ||
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
PT | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
MC | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SI | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RO | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
PL | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
SM | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
CY | 01.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.11.2017 | ||
DK | 01.11.2017 | ||
EE | 01.11.2017 | ||
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
SK | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 01.11.2017 | |
FI | 01.11.2017 | ||
HR | 01.11.2017 | ||
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
LV | 01.11.2017 | ||
RS | 01.11.2017 | ||
SE | 01.11.2017 | ||
BG | 01.02.2018 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | ||
GR | 02.02.2018 | ||
IS | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 01.11.2017 | |
LT | 01.11.2017 | ||
NO | 01.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4763667 (MANZO MICHAEL P [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 53 - line 57 *; | [Y]US6004295 (LANGER ANATOLY [CA], et al) [Y] 32-47 * column 5, line 13 - column 6, line 65; figures 1-7 *; | [I]US6723082 (PAYNE SAM G [US], et al) [I] 1-8,10-31,48-55 * column 10, line 59 - column 12, line 10; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US6743206 (SMITH KEVIN W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 5, line 59 - column 6, line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006200083 (FREYMAN TOBY [US], et al) [A] 32-47* abstract *; | [A]US2009270806 (MACAULAY PATRICK [US], et al) [A] 9 * paragraph [0039]; figures 3, 7 *; | [Y]US2010048990 (BAKOS GREGORY J [US]) [Y] 9 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053]; figures 12-14 *; | [A]US2010217073 (FISCHER KLAUS [DE], et al) [A] 9 * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066]; figures 13, 14 *; | [IY]US2010312173 (MCKAY WILLIAM F [US], et al) [I] 1-8,13-31,48-55 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0059]; figures 5f, 5g, 9 * [Y] 9,32-47; | [I]US2011160533 (SAMPSON RUSSEL M [US]) [I] 1,29,48-55 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2013107068 (MICRO TECH NANJING CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 9 * abstract * |