EP2963308 - RETAINER FOR RADIAL NEEDLE BEARING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states NSK Ltd. 6-3 Ohsaki 1-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8560 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIBASHI, Yutaka c/o NSK Ltd. 941-2 Nakasatomi-machi Maebashi-shi Gunma 370-3344 / JP | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Morelle & Bardou SC Parc Technologique du Canal 9, avenue de l'Europe BP 72253 31522 Ramonville Saint Agne Cedex / FR | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14756939.6 | 27.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014JP54886 | Priority number, date | JP20130040386 | 01.03.2013 Original published format: JP 2013040386 | [2016/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014133083 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963308 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/54, F16C33/46 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
F16C33/4676 (EP,US);
F16C33/4629 (US);
F16C33/541 (EP,US);
F16C33/546 (EP,US);
F16C19/463 (EP,US);
F16C2240/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | F16C33/54, F16C19/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | HALTER FÜR EIN RADIALNADELLAGER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2016/01] | English: | RETAINER FOR RADIAL NEEDLE BEARING AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2016/01] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE RETENUE POUR PALIER À AIGUILLE RADIAL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CE DERNIER | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2015 | Translation filed | 31.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2015 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 04.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 16.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US5803620 (YOKOTA YASUNORI [JP]) [X] 1-4 * figures 8-11 * [Y] 7-14 [I] 5,6; | [XY]US6007254 (FUJIOKA NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * figures 2-3b * [Y] 7-14; | [XYI]DE2147170 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-8 * [Y] 7-14 [I] 6; | [XYI]US2007076998 (WINZELER JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,11 * figures 1-3c * [Y] 7-14 [I] 8,10; | [XDYI]JPH11101242 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [XD] 1,2,4-6 * figures 2-3b * [Y] 8-14 [I] 3,7; | [XD]JPH053645U (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 1-3 * figures 1-8 *; | [X]JP2009156393 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-22 *; | [Y]JPH01174629U (NSK LTD.) [Y] 8,12-14 * figures 1,3 *; | [Y]JP2000213545 (NSK LTD) [Y] 8,12-14 * figures 1-11 *; | [Y]JPH0296020U (NTN CORP.) [Y] 7,8 * figures 1-6 *; | [Y]JPS5295570 (UTSUNOMIYA KIKI KK) [Y] 12 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2009041757 (NSK LTD, et al) [Y] 13 * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]JP2007078097 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 14 * figure 3 *; | [Y]JP2007024118 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [Y] 14 * figure 3 * | International search | [X]JPH11101242 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [X]JP2005195142 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [X]JP2009156393 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [X]JP2011127645 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08792U (KOYO SEIKO CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH07259865 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JPH0296020U (NTN CORP.); | [Y]JP2002115723 (KOYO SEIKO CO); | [Y]JP2000320558 (NSK LTD); | [Y]JPH01174629U (NSK LTD.); | [Y]JP2000213545 (NSK LTD); | [Y]JPS5295570 (UTSUNOMIYA KIKI KK); | [Y]JP2009041757 (NSK LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2007078097 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD); | [Y]JP2007024118 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2006342883 | JPH08270658 | JPH0441115U | JPH053645U | JP2005233317 | JP2007211934 | JP2008215605 | JP2008249047 | JPH11101242 |