EP2963639 - PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAEBARA, Toshiaki c/o NEC MOBILE COMMUNICATIONS, LTD. 1753, Shimonumabe Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8666 / JP | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14757113.7 | 25.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014JP54564 | Priority number, date | JP20130037506 | 27.02.2013 Original published format: JP 2013037506 | [2016/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014132965 | Date: | 04.09.2014 | Language: | JA | [2014/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2963639 | Date: | 06.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.09.2014 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/14, G06F3/041, H04M1/00, H04M1/247, // G09G5/00, G06F1/16, G06F3/147 | [2016/40] | CPC: |
G06F3/1423 (EP,US);
G06F1/1601 (US);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/1431 (EP,US);
G06F3/1446 (EP,US);
G06F3/147 (US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2354/00 (EP,US);
H04M1/0256 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/01] | G09G5/00, H04M1/00, H04M1/247 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, STEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND PROGRAMM | [2016/01] | English: | PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE, CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR, AND PROGRAM | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTATIF, SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE, ET PROGRAMME | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2015 | Translation filed | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/01] | 29.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2020 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004212602 (NAKO KAZUYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * figures 5-7,19,36-38 * * paragraphs [0014] , [0031] - [0035] - [0096] - [0098] - [0134] , [0171] - [0176] *; | [X]US2010298032 (LEE KHWANHEE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,12,13 * figures 1-11 ** paragraphs [0009] , [0074] - [0076] - [0089] , [0094] - [0097] - [0101] , [0105] - [0111] - [0116] *; | [X]US2012274588 (BAMBA HIROYUKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,9,10,12,13 * figures 1-11 * * paragraphs [0025] , [0031] , [0032] , [0043] - [0049] - [0052] , [0053] , [0056] , [0069] * | International search | [A]JP2005150936 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al); | [A]JP2008532185 (APPLE INC.); | [A]JP2009005039 (CASIO HITACHI MOBILE COMM CO); | [A]JP2010193355 (NEC CORP); | [X]JP2011109457 (NEC CORP); | [Y]WO2011099581 (KYOCERA CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO2012049942 (NEC CASIO MOBILE COMM LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2013047866 (KYOCERA CORP); | [AP]WO2013047182 (NEC CASIO MOBILE COMM LTD [JP], et al); | [Y] - YUKI KAI, "MEDIAS W N-05E', First Impression", (20130220), URL: HTTP://WEB.ARCHIVE.ORG/WEB/20130223111308/HTTP://K-TAI.IMPRESS.CO.JP/DOCS/REVIEW/20130220_588422.HTML?, (20140519), XP055292607 | by applicant | JP2009267809 |