Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10148928 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2018 | B2 | US2017257612 | 07.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 | US201361875683 | 09.09.2013 | US201715601559 | 22.05.2017 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2923807 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | C | CA2923807 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 | WO2014US48562 | 29.07.2014 | US201361875683 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3044725 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2021 | B1 | EP3044725 | 20.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 | WO2014US48562 | 29.07.2014 | US201361875683 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112016005261 | 04.10.2022 | A8 | BR112016005261 | 20.03.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 | WO2014US48562 | 29.07.2014 | US201361875683 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX349610 | 04.08.2017 | B | MX2016003075 | 26.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 | WO2014US48562 | 29.07.2014 | US201361875683 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015034591 | Global Dossier | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 | US201361875683 | 09.09.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9693030 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2017 | B2 | US2015070587 | 12.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 | US201361875683 | 09.09.2013 |