EP3044725 - GENERATING ALERTS BASED UPON DETECTOR OUTPUTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARRIS Enterprises LLC 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2016/32] | For all designated states ARRIS Enterprises, Inc. 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | ||
Former [2016/29] | For all designated states General Instrument Corporation 101 Tournament Drive Horsham, Pennsylvania 19044 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EMEOTT, Stephen P. 5608 Silentbrook Lane Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60008 / US | 02 /
BAUM, Kevin L. 3450 Richnee Lane Rolling Meadows, Illinois 60008 / US | 03 /
GANDHI, Bhavan 62 East Depot Street Vernon Hills, Illinois 60061 / US | 04 /
ISHTIAQ, Faisal 5415 Sheridan Chicago, Illinois 60640 / US | 05 /
OULD DELLAHY, Isselmou 3240 Sienna Drive Lake in the Hills, Illinois 60156 / US | [2016/29] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2016/29] | Application number, filing date | 14758002.1 | 29.07.2014 | [2016/29] | WO2014US48562 | Priority number, date | US201361875683P | 09.09.2013 Original published format: US 201361875683 P | US201414444934 | 28.07.2014 Original published format: US201414444934 | [2016/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015034591 | Date: | 12.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3044725 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3044725 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/32, H04N21/234, H04N21/2343, H04N21/4722, H04N21/4728, H04N21/478 | [2016/29] | CPC: |
H04N21/23418 (EP,US);
H04N9/74 (US);
G06V20/40 (EP,US);
G06V20/635 (EP,US);
G06V30/224 (US);
H04N21/234336 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4722 (EP,US);
H04N21/4725 (EP,US);
H04N21/4728 (EP,US);
H04N21/47815 (EP,US);
H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
H04N21/8549 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ALARMERZEUGUNG AUF DER BASIS VON DETEKTORAUSGABEN | [2016/29] | English: | GENERATING ALERTS BASED UPON DETECTOR OUTPUTS | [2016/29] | French: | GÉNÉRATION D'ALERTES SUR LA BASE DE SORTIES DE DÉTECTEUR | [2016/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2016 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2016 | Examination requested [2016/29] | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.10.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2014 | AL | 07.04.2021 | AT | 07.04.2021 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | FI | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | IT | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | PL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | RS | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IE | 29.07.2021 | LU | 29.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 29.07.2014 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 29.07.2014 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 29.07.2014 | |
AL | 07.04.2021 | ||
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
IT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IE | 29.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 07.04.2021 | |
AT | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 29.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
PL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RS | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 07.04.2021 | |
FI | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO03051031 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,18-20 * page 6, line 17 - page 20, line 7; figures 1-14 * [I] 5-11,13,14; | [XI]US2007214488 (NGUYEN PHUONG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,18-20 * the whole document * [I] 5-11,13,14; | [XI]US2008091713 (CANDELORE BRANT L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,12,18-20 * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0167]; figures 2-6 * [I] 5-11,13,14,17; | [A]US2008127253 (ZHANG MIN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XI]WO2012027594 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,14-17,20 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0113]; figures 3-9 * [I] 4,8,11,12,18,19; | [A]US2013182182 (MOUNTAIN DALE [GB]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * |