EP3001809 - METHOD FOR CONDITIONING HAIR AND SKIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/14] | METHODS FOR FIXING HAIR AND SKIN | ||
[2016/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LIQWD, INC. 1482 East Valley Road, No.701 Santa Barbara, California 93108 / US | [2016/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRESSLY, Eric D. 1520A Miramar Beach Santa Barbara, California 93108 / US | 02 /
HAWKER, Craig J. 1420 Greenworth Place Santa Barbara, California 93108 / US | [2016/14] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/14] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14758005.4 | 01.08.2014 | [2016/14] | WO2014US49388 | Priority number, date | US201361861281P | 01.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361861281 P | US201361867872P | 20.08.2013 Original published format: US 201361867872 P | US201361885898P | 02.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361885898 P | US201361903239P | 12.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361903239 P | US201414257089 | 21.04.2014 Original published format: US201414257089 | US201414257056 | 21.04.2014 Original published format: US201414257056 | US201414257076 | 21.04.2014 Original published format: US201414257076 | US201462000340P | 19.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462000340 P | [2016/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015017768 | Date: | 05.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3001809 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3001809 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/362, A61K8/41, A61Q5/00, A61Q5/04, A61Q5/08, A61Q5/10 | [2016/14] | CPC: |
A61Q5/065 (EP,KR);
A61K8/46 (EP,KR);
A61K8/416 (EP,GB,KR);
A61K8/36 (GB);
A61K8/362 (KR);
A61K8/41 (KR);
A61Q5/002 (EP,KR);
A61Q5/004 (EP,KR);
A61Q5/02 (EP,KR);
A61Q5/04 (EP,KR);
A61Q5/08 (EP);
A61Q5/12 (EP,GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] |
Former [2016/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 30.12.2015 | ME | 30.12.2015 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONDITIONIEREN VON HAAR UND HAUT | [2016/50] | English: | METHOD FOR CONDITIONING HAIR AND SKIN | [2016/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CONDITIONNEMENT CAPILLAIRE ET CUTANÉ | [2016/50] |
Former [2016/14] | VERFAHREN ZUR FIXIERUNG VON HAAREN UND HAUT | ||
Former [2016/14] | METHODS FOR FIXING HAIR AND SKIN | ||
Former [2016/14] | PROCÉDÉS DE RÉPARATION DES CHEVEUX ET DE LA PEAU | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/14] | 13.05.2016 | Observations by third parties | 18.05.2016 | Observations by third parties | 23.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2016 | Observations by third parties | 04.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17163334.0 / EP3326606 | EP21205823.4 / EP4008306 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SM | 12.07.2017 | [2018/27] | Cited in | International search | [I]GB773559 (GILLETTE CO) [I] 1-75 * the whole document *; | [X]US3142623 (CHARLES ZVIAK, et al) [X] 25,57 * example -; claim - *; | [XI]US4532950 (LANG GUENTHER [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10,11,13,14,17,18,23,24,70,73-75 * column 2, line 1 - line 5; examples 1-6 * [I] 1-75; | [XI]US5833966 (SAMAIN HENRI [FR]) [X] 1,3-5,7,8,10,11,14,15,17-24,57,58,60-62,64,65,67,68,70,73-75 * column 8, line 7 - line 14; example 4 * [I] 1-75; | [I]EP1174112 (KAO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-75 * paragraph [0001] ** paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] *; | [Y]DE10051774 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-75 * paragraph [0017]; claim - *; | [Y]DE10051773 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-75 * paragraph [0012]; claim - *; | [X]US2006024257 (CHANG TAE S [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10-14,17-24,70,72-75 * examples 1-24,26,27 *; | [Y]DE102004052480 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-75 * claim - * | Examination | GB741307 | US3472243 | US2004086475 | JP2006327994 | JP2009007283 | WO2014125452 | by applicant | WO9308787 | WO9501152 | US5656265 | US6706258 | US7598213 | - DOMBRINK ET AL., CHEM MATTERS, (1983), page 8 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, pages 445 - 448 | - RUSSIAN JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 43, pages 319 - 349 | other | US3472243 | WO2014125452 | GB741307 | GB773559 | US5833966 | US2004086475 | US2005087718 | US2006024257 | JP2006327994 | JP2009007283 |