EP3039002 - PROCESS FOR THE CONVERSION OF SACCHARIDE-CONTAINING FEEDSTOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2020 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: NL | published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2018/13] |
Former [2016/27] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER HEIDE, Evert Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
HUIZENGA, Pieter Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | [2016/27] | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/27] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 14758127.6 | 29.08.2014 | [2016/27] | WO2014EP68350 | Priority number, date | EP20130182406 | 30.08.2013 Original published format: EP 13182406 | [2016/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015028593 | Date: | 05.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3039002 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.03.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3039002 | Date: | 25.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/132, C07C29/60, C07C31/20 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
C07C29/60 (EP,US);
C07C29/132 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/132, C07C31/202 (EP,US);
C07C29/60, C07C31/205 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2016/27] | C07C29/00, C07C31/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONVERTIERUNG VON SACCHARIDHALTIGEM ROHMATERIAL | [2018/12] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE CONVERSION OF SACCHARIDE-CONTAINING FEEDSTOCK | [2016/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE PRODUIT DE DÉPART COMPRENANT UN SACCHARIDE | [2018/12] |
Former [2016/27] | VERFAHREN ZUR UMWANDLUNG EINES SACCHARIDHALTIGEN ROHSTOFFES | ||
Former [2016/27] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION DE CHARGE DE DÉPART CONTENANT UN SACCHARIDE | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/27] | 06.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2014 | AL | 25.07.2018 | AT | 25.07.2018 | CY | 25.07.2018 | CZ | 25.07.2018 | DK | 25.07.2018 | EE | 25.07.2018 | ES | 25.07.2018 | FI | 25.07.2018 | HR | 25.07.2018 | IT | 25.07.2018 | LT | 25.07.2018 | LV | 25.07.2018 | MC | 25.07.2018 | MK | 25.07.2018 | PL | 25.07.2018 | PT | 25.07.2018 | RO | 25.07.2018 | RS | 25.07.2018 | SE | 25.07.2018 | SI | 25.07.2018 | SK | 25.07.2018 | SM | 25.07.2018 | TR | 25.07.2018 | IE | 29.08.2018 | LU | 29.08.2018 | MT | 29.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | BG | 25.10.2018 | GB | 25.10.2018 | NO | 25.10.2018 | GR | 26.10.2018 | IS | 25.11.2018 | [2020/39] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CY | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
MK | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 29.08.2014 | |
AL | 25.07.2018 | ||
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IE | 29.08.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
PT | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
TR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
MT | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
GB | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SI | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.09.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
DK | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
SM | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
EE | 25.07.2018 | ||
ES | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
MC | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
SK | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RO | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
IT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
LU | 29.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 25.07.2018 | |
AT | 25.07.2018 | ||
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
LV | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
HR | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.07.2018 | |
FI | 25.07.2018 | ||
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
PL | 25.07.2018 | ||
RS | 25.07.2018 | ||
SE | 25.07.2018 | ||
BG | 25.10.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
GR | 26.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 25.07.2018 | |
LT | 25.07.2018 | ||
NO | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 25.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 25.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XDAI]US2011313212 (KALNES TOM N [US], et al) [XD] 1,5-8,10 * paragraphs [0007] , [0 15] , [0 18] , [0 32]; claim 1 * [A] 2,3,9 [I] 4; | [XAI]WO2013015955 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 14] - [0017] - [0 21]; claims 1, 4 * [A] 2,3,7[I] 4 |